Calvert v. Fessenden
Plaintiff: Mark Calvert
Defendant: Beau R Fessenden
Case Number: 2:2016cv00356
Filed: March 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 10 Notice of Settlement. The Court understands that terms of a final settlement were reached, but the settlement is dependent upon the sale of real estate, which remains pending. Accordingly, the Court refers these matters to the Bankruptcy Court for a Report and Recommendation. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) (cc: Bankruptcy Court)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER. The parties were ordered to appear before the Court for a status conference on November 28, 2017. (Dkt. No. 15 .) Defendant Beau R. Fessenden did not appear. Mr. Fessenden is therefore ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE for his failure to appear. Mr. Fessenden's response shall be no more than three (3) pages and is due on or before December 1, 2017. (TH)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER directing parties to appear for a Status Conference set for 11/28/2017 at 09:00 AM before U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour to discuss the status of this case, as well as the related Case No. C15-1253-JCC. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER directing Plaintiff to submit a status report within 21 days of this order. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calvert v. Fessenden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Calvert
Represented By: Jane Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beau R Fessenden
Represented By: Lawrence Ronald Cock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?