Muse v. Huntleigh USA Corporation
Plaintiff: Alin Muse
Defendant: Huntleigh USA Corporation
Case Number: 2:2016cv00357
Filed: March 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 51 Motion for Final Approval of Settlement, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(SWT)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting parties' 44 Stipulated Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement; Final Hearing set for 2/22/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 15106, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(SWT)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 42 Stipulated Motion to Obtain Temporary Stay for 45 days; Status Report in 45 days, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 40 Stipulated Motion to obtain temporary stay for 60 days; all trial and pretrial deadlines are vacated by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 27 Motion For Leave to Amend Complaint, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Plaintiff may, within fourteen days of the date of this Order, file an amended complaint adding claims against Sporn, Galford, and Fox. (KERR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muse v. Huntleigh USA Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alin Muse
Represented By: Cleveland Stockmeyer
Represented By: Duncan Calvert Turner
Represented By: Daniel R Whitmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntleigh USA Corporation
Represented By: Vanessa B Chambers
Represented By: Kenneth J Diamond
Represented By: Stephen B Maule(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: John B Renick(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?