Kumar v. Convenience Retailers LLC et al
Plaintiff: Raj Kumar
Defendant: Convenience Retailers LLC and Eagle Canyon Capital, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv00364
Filed: March 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Agreed PRETRIAL ORDER by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION OF TRIAL-RELATED DEADLINES. The deadline to file trial briefs, proposed voir dire questions, proposed juryinstructions and to submit trial exhibits to the Court is extended from November 1, 2017 to November 8, 2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER - The above referenced case is reassigned to the Honorable James L. Robart. The trial will commence on November 15, 2017. Counsel should contact Ashleigh Drecktrah, In-Court Deputy to the Honorable James L. Robart at 206-370-8520, upon receipt of this order. All future pleadings filed in this case shall bear case number C16-364JLR. (KERR)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re parties' 18 Stipulated Motion; Attorneys Loyd Willaford and Sarah E. Derry for Plaintiff Raj Kumar added; Attorney Jie Woo Kim and Patrick Leo McGuigan terminated; by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kumar v. Convenience Retailers LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raj Kumar
Represented By: Patrick Leo McGuigan
Represented By: Loyd Willaford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Convenience Retailers LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Canyon Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?