Hawkins v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Sabelita Hawkins
Defendant: United States of America, Department of Veterans Affairs, VA Puget Sound Health Care System, John Does 1-10 and Jane Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2016cv00498
Filed: April 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 45 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler.(CDA)ad hoc 9th Circuit/ cc plaintiff via US Mail
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting Government's 36 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction; dismissing this case with prejudice. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER directing parties to file a Joint Status Report no later than 10 days after entry of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting Government's 16 Motion to Dismiss and dismissing case without prejudice as to the United States of America and with prejudice as to Department of Veterans Affairs, VA Puget Sound Health Care System, John Does 1-10, and Jane Does 1-10. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER directing parties to properly authenticate their exhibits no later than Tuesday, July 25, 2017, at 5:00 p.m ; If either party objects to the other party's authentication, the objecting party must file a statement of its objections no later than Wednesday, July 26, 2017, at 5:00 p.m. ; re Plaintiff's 17 Response to Motion, Government's 16 MOTION to Dismiss, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting parties' 14 stipulated motion and extending the discovery cut-off to 6/20/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER directing parties to file statements re discovery issue by 5/22/2017 at 3:00 p.m. Ms. Hawkins to provide a copy of this order on any Jane or John Doe Defendants or their putative counsel by 5/22/2017 at 9:00 a.m. Telephone Conference set for 5 /23/2017 at 02:00 PM before Judge James L. Robart. Should any Jane or John Doe Defendant or his or her counsel wish to appear at the telephonic hearing, he or she must appear in this matter pursuant to the Local Civil Rules for the Western District of Washington no later than Monday, May 22, 2017, at 3:00 p.m. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting in part and denying in part the parties' 11 Stipulated Motion to Continue Discovery Deadlines. The court GRANTS the parties' motion to extend their expert disclosure deadline to April 30, 2017, but DENIES the parties' motion to extend the discovery cut-off and other discovery-related dates. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawkins v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabelita Hawkins
Represented By: Tuella O Sykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VA Puget Sound Health Care System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?