Daimler AG v Amazon.com Inc
Plaintiff: Daimler AG
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc
Case Number: 2:2016cv00518
Filed: April 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing all claims and all remaining defendants in this matter with prejudice per parties' 49 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER re: parties' 47 Stipulated Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Jury Trial is set for 4/20/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 10/18/2019, Discovery Motions d ue by 11/18/2019, Discovery completed by 12/20/2019, Dispositive motions due by 1/13/2020, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 3/2/2020, Motions in Limine due by 3/16/2020, Agreed Pretrial Order due by 4/3/2020, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 4/10/2020. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER re parties' 45 Stipulated Motion to Amend Scheduling Order: Jury Trial is set for 2/18/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez; Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 8/19/2019; Discovery Motions due by 9/17/2019; Discovery completed by 10/21/2019; Dispositive motions due by 11/14/2019; 39.1 mediation to be completed by 1/2/2020; Motions in Limine due by 1/16/2020; Pretrial Order due by 2/3/2020; Trial briefs, proposed voir dire, jury instructions, neutral statement of the case, trial exhibits due by 2/10/2020. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.(MW)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 **AMENDED** ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND RELATED DATES re: 40 Stipulated Motion. Jury Trial is set for 8/19/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 2/19/2019, Discovery motions due 3/21/2019; Discovery completed by 4/22/2019, Dispositive motions due by 5/20/2019, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 7/5/2019, Motions in Limine due by 7/22/2019, Agreed Pretrial Order due by 8/6/2019, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs /trial exhibits due by 8/14/2019. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 35 Stipulated Motion Amended Scheduling Order. Deadlines for infringement and invalidity contentions, Markman-expert reports, claim construction exchanges and briefing, and the Markman hearing are stricken. No other dates in the Scheduling Order 32 are modified. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. This stipulated extension continues Amazon's response date to November 3, 2017. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 21 Motion to Lift Stay signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daimler AG v Amazon.com Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daimler AG
Represented By: Larry E Altenbrun
Represented By: Joanna Lee Cohn(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Timothy W. Johnson(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Shauna M Wertheim(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc
Represented By: Grant E Kinsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?