United States of America v. Pomerantz

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Jeffrey P Pomerantz
Case Number: 2:2016cv00689
Filed: May 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Whatcom
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER OF JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against Jeffrey P Pomerantz in the amount of $860,300.35 together with interest, penalties and administrative costs pursuant to 31 U.S.C. § 3717, and 31 C.F.R. § 901.9 from May 13, 2016 until the date that judgment is entered. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER directing Jeffrey Pomerantz to appear at his deposition on June 27, 2018 in Bellingham, Washington, at a time and address to be determined by counsel for Plaintiff and communicated to Defendant. Defendant ordered to respond to all outstanding discovery requests by 6/27/2018. Defendant's 33 Motion for Protective Order is stricken. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying Defendant's 19 motion to dismiss and denying motion to strike portions of the amended complaint. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying Defendant's motion to transfer but granting Defendant's motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim (Dkt. # 9 ); granting the Government leave to amend its complaint; amended complaint due in 21 days. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting Defendant's 14 Motion to Stay Rule 26(f) Conference; the requirements of the Scheduling Order 12 are stayed until such time as the Court rules on the Defendant's motion to dismiss 9 . Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 5 Motion to authorize alternative service of process. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed for failure to comply with Rule 4 and/or prosecute this action. Response due within ten (10) days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart on 2/22/17. (swt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Pomerantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey P Pomerantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Paul T. Butler(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?