Dale v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Kathryn Dale
Defendant: Carolyn W Colvin
Case Number: 2:2016cv00910
Filed: June 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Skagit
Presiding Judge: David W. Christel
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 24 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond: The Government's response to Plaintiff's 19 Motion for Attorney Fees under 42 U.S.C. 406(b) is due 12/7/2020. Any reply shall be filed on or before 12/10/2020. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MW)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 22 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The Clerk of Court is directed to renote plaintiff's motion for attorney's fees (Dkt. # 19 ) on the Court's calendar for Friday, 10/9/2020. The Government's response is due on or before 10/5/2020. Any reply shall be filed on or before the note date. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 Stipulated Motion for Attorney Fees by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; matter is reversed and remanded by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dale v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Dale
Represented By: Amy Gilbrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W Colvin
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?