Integrity Trust et al v. Capital One, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Integrity Trust
Defendant: Capital One NA, Chevy Chase Bank, FSB, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Chicago Title Co and John Does 1-50
Case Number: 2:2016cv00927
Filed: June 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal re parties' 46 Stipulated Motion; all claims in this lawsuit are dismissed with prejudice and without costs to any party, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 44 Motion for Reconsideration of Sanctions, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(SWT)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Awarding Fees and Dismissing Case, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting Defendants Capital One NA and MERS' 29 Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions and Attorneys' Fees; Defendants are ordered to submit a statement of reasonable attorneys' fees incurred in defending this action within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER RENOTING 29 MOTION for Sanctions and Attorneys' Fees; Noting Date 2/24/2017, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Plaintiff's response due by 2/15/17. Defendants' reply due by 2/24/17. (KERR)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting MERS'S 15 Motion to Dismiss and Capital One's Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Integrity Trust et al v. Capital One, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Integrity Trust
Represented By: J. Jarrette Sandlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One NA
Represented By: John Alan Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevy Chase Bank, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc
Represented By: John Alan Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Title Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?