United States of America v. Schmidt et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: William P. Schmidt, Sufian Hamad, Riverton Holding, LLC and King County
Case Number: 2:2016cv00985
Filed: June 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM OF DECISION; directing the Clerk of Court to enter judgment against defendant William P. Schmidt and in favor of the United States, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (cc: William P Schmidt via USPS)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER denying plaintiff's 63 Motion to Disqualify and Exclude David E. Hunnicutt; granting plaintiff's 64 Motion in Limine, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) cc: William Schmidt via USPS
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Regarding Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment. The United States' motions for summary judgment (Dkt.# 48 ) is GRANTED in part. William P. Schmidt is indebted to the United States in the amount of $660,428.38 as of June 20, 2016, less any subsequent payments or credits, plus interest and other statutory additions as provided by law. In all other respects, the cross-motions for summary judgment (Dkt. # 48 and Dkt. # 50 ) are DENIED. The issue of whether the transfer of the 4010 Property is voidable such that the United States may foreclose its lien on the property will be resolved at trial. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TH) (cc: Pro Se Party via U.S. Mail).
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER directing Clerk to resend to William P. Schmidt 61 Order Awarding Fees, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (cc: William P. Schmidt as directed via USPS)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 44 Motion for Sanctions and an Award of Fees, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (cc: William Schmidt via USPS)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting govt's 36 Motion to Compel signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS) cc Schmidt
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying defendant William P. Schmidt's 33 Notice of Lack of Jurisdiction and Demand for Hearing to Order Proof of Jurisdiction, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM) cc: Schmidt via the U.S. Mail
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting govt's 40 Motion for Extension of Time; Expert Witness List extended to 8/2/2017, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying without prejudice to refiling at the close of discovery defendants' 13 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting government's 16 Motion for Relief under Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(d), by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (swt) (cc: defendant William P. Schmidt via USPS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Schmidt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Yael Bortnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sufian Hamad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverton Holding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?