Hoffman v. One Technologies, LLC
Plaintiff: Mark Hoffman
Defendant: One Technologies, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv01006
Filed: June 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION AND ORDER re parties' 44 Joint Motion to Dismiss; Any and all claims or causes of action asserted by Plaintiff are dismissed with prejudice and without costs or fees, and without prejudice to any Class Members. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION AND ORDER to stay case pending mediation re parties' 42 Stipulation; directing parties to report to the Court no later than 4/9/2018, the results of mediation, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER Amending Case Schedule (First Request). Jury Trial is set for 12/3/2018 before Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 6/6/2018, Discovery completed by 8/3/2018, Dispositive mo tions due by 9/6/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 4/6/2018, Settlement Conference set for 7/25/2018 before Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Motions in Limine due by 10/15/2018, Pretrial Order due by 11/2/2018, Trial briefs to be submitted by 11/30/2018, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 11/30/2018, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TH)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 AGREEMENT REGARDING DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION AND ORDER re parties' 28 Stipulation, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying defendant's 13 Partial Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoffman v. One Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Hoffman
Represented By: Albert H. Kirby
Represented By: Kim Williams
Represented By: Roblin John Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Scott Okrent
Represented By: Ari N. Rothman(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Craig Steven Sternberg
Represented By: Danielle Sunberg(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?