Viesse v. Tacoma Screw Products, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Albert Viesse
Defendant: Tacoma Screw Products Inc and Does
Case Number: 2:2016cv01026
Filed: July 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 JUDGMENT AND FINAL APPROVAL ORDER re Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, approval of the attorney fee expense award, and approval of the incentive payment (Dkt. Nos. 48 , 52 ). The Court GRANTS the motion and AWARDS the relief requested. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 44 Unopposed Motion for class certification, the appointment of a class representative and its attorney, the appointment of a settlement administrator, the approval of the notice of settlement, the preliminary appro val of the settlement agreement, and the establishment of related deadlines. The Court will hold a final (fairness) hearing on April 3, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. to consider the fairness, reasonableness, and adequacy of the proposed Settlement, as well as Class Counsel's fees and costs and the Class Representative's service (incentive) award. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiff's 38 Motion to strike or stay Defendant's motion to dismiss. Plaintiff's response due 8/21/2017; Defendant's reply due 8/25/2017. Clerk directed to remove the statistical closure of the case. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER granting 33 stipulated motion to extend the class certification briefing schedule. Parties to report back to the Court by 9/6/2017 re status of case and any briefing schedule changes. Clerk directed to statistically close case. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting 25 Stipulated Motion to Seal. Exhibits 4 and 5, filed under seal as Docket Numbers 26 and 27 , shall remain under seal. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 23 Amended Motion for Protective Order. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Viesse v. Tacoma Screw Products, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Viesse
Represented By: James A. Sturdevant
Represented By: Chant Yedalian(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tacoma Screw Products Inc
Represented By: Jaime Drozd Allen
Represented By: Stephen M. Rummage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?