Johnson et al v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Plaintiff: Robert Johnson and Kristin Johnson
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv01031
Filed: July 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Whatcom
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying Johnsons' 31 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and declining to rule in part on Nationstar's 16 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Specifically, the court GRANTS Nationstar's motion and enters summary judgment for Nationstar on the Johnsons' FDCPA claim, but DECLINES TO RULE on Nationstar's request for summary judgment on the Johnsons' CPA claim. Instead, having granted summary judgment in Nationstar's favor on the only federal claim in the Johnsons' complaint, the court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Johnsons' remaining state law claims and dismisses those claims without prejudice. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER REGARDING THE PARTIES' LETTERS CONCERNING MEDIATION by Judge James L. Robart. (RS)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant Nationstar's 22 Motion for Protective Order. The court ORDERS Nationstar to produce its designated witness for a Rule 30(b)(6) deposition on June 19, 2017. The court further ORDERS the parties to conduct the Rule 30(b)(6) deposition by telephone or videoconference. If Nationstar does not wish its Rule 30(b)(6) witness to be deposed via a telephone or video link, then the court ORDERS Nationstar to produce its witness in Seattle, Washington on June 19, 2017, for an in-person Rule 30(b)(6) deposition. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge James L. Robart granting 21 Stipulated Motion re Confidential Materials. (PM)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER striking without prejudice Plaintiffs Robert Johnson and Kristin Johnson's 13 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Johnson
Represented By: James A. Sturdevant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Johnson
Represented By: James A. Sturdevant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Ann T Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?