Veljanoski v. Juno Therapeutics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Goce Veljanoski
Defendant: Juno Therapeutics Inc and Hans E Bishop
Case Number: 2:2016cv01069
Filed: July 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER FOR DISTRIBUTION OF CLASS SETTLEMENT FUND re: Plaintiffs' 130 Motion for distribution of class settlement fund. The Court directs and authorizes the payment from the Settlement Fund of the $55,532.78 to the Claims Administrator. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 122 Motion for Leave to File Two Over-Length Motions. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SWT)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 PRELINARY APPROVAL ORDER re parties' 120 Stipulated Motion for preliminary approval of class action settlement. A hearing (the "Final Approval Hearing") is hereby scheduled to be held before the Court on November 16, 2018, at 11:00 am. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (TH)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 STIPULATION AND ORDER re Overlength Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement re parties' 118 Stipulation signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE AMENDMENT TO THE NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF CLASS ACTION signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 109 Motion for an Order Regarding Program and Notice to the Class signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting plaintiffs' 98 Motion to Certify Class, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STIPULATION AND ORDER re parties' 93 Stipulated Motion for Partial Amendment of Scheduling Order, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 STIPULATION REGARDING DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION AND ORDER by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending deadlines; Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/17/2017, Joint Status Report due by 7/13/2017, by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 75 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer by 7/21/17 signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER denying defendants' 55 Motion to Dismiss signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER denying plaintiff's 70 Motion for leave to file response by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting defendants' 60 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Veljanoski v. Juno Therapeutics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Goce Veljanoski
Represented By: Jeffrey C Block(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Joel Fleming(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Represented By: Janissa Ann Strabuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juno Therapeutics Inc
Represented By: Drew Liming(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Nina F Locker(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Joni Ostler(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Ignacio E Salceda(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Gregory Lewis Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hans E Bishop
Represented By: Drew Liming(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Nina F Locker(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Joni Ostler(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Ignacio E Salceda(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Gregory Lewis Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?