State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al v. Peter J. Hanson, P.C. et al
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Defendant: Peter J. Hanson, P.C. and Peter J. Hanson
Case Number: 2:2016cv01085
Filed: July 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice re parties' 99 Stipulated Motion, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER denying defendants' 68 Motion for Summary Judgment; directing the Clerk of Court to seal Dkt. 68 ; Defendants shall, within seven days of the date of this Order, file an appropriately redacted version of the motion, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER re defendants' 67 Motion to Seal, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting 71 Stipulated Motion to re-note Plaintiff's 61 MOTION to Compel Experts Laurin McElheran and Arthur Croft to Produce Documents and Information; Noting Date is 10/27/2017. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Re-note Plaintiff's 61 Motion to Compel Expert Productions : Noting Date 10/20/2017; re parties' 63 Stipulated Motion, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(SWT)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATED ORDER regarding Plaintiff's 57 MOTION to Compel re parties' 59 Stipulated Motion; State Farm plaintiffs agree that the Motion to Compel (Dkt. 57 ) is withdrawn, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION AND ORDER to extend certain pretrial deadlines re parties' 55 Stipulated; Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 9/1/2017, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying Defendants' 48 Motion to Amend Counterclaims, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 49 Motion for Leave to File Over-Length Brief, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER AWARDING FEES by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER REGARDING FEES by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting parties' 38 Stipulated Motion for Clarification Regarding Production of Patient Information, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (swt)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' 29 MOTION TO COMPEL, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al v. Peter J. Hanson, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven W Fogg
Represented By: Kayla L. Pragid(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: David I. Spector(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Todd T Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Steven W Fogg
Represented By: Kayla L. Pragid(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: David I. Spector(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Todd T Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter J. Hanson, P.C.
Represented By: Gregory Paul Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter J. Hanson
Represented By: Gregory Paul Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?