Mao et al v. US Bank National Association et al
Plaintiff: Rui Mao, Zhen Fan, Wenlan Huang, Shuangyan Jia, Tieyin Li, Huaijin Liu, Zhicui Shan, Yao Song, Hailan Tang, Haitao Xu, Xiuqin Yang, Zhaohui Ye, Junhong Zhang, Dianyi Zhou, Jia Yin Zhu, Qingbin Bu, Rui Fan, Jiangang Han, Bing Huang, Zhongfa Liu, Xinyuan Mu, Peilin Wu, Zhongmei Zhao and Xiaoyu Zhu
Defendant: US Bank National Association, Quartzburg Gold, ISR Capital, Idaho State Regional Center and Sima Muroff
Case Number: 2:2016cv01113
Filed: July 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND STIPULATED MOTION AND ORDER TO EXTEND STAY re: 95 Stipulated Motion. The Parties are directed to submit a further joint status report, together with a proposed case schedule, if appropriate, within ninety (90) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting leave for withdrawal and substitution of counsel. Attorneys Thomas Matthew Brennan and Eric B Swartz are withdrawing and Attorneys Sean C Knowles, Austin Rice-Stitt and Sean T. Prosser (pro hac vice pending) are substituted for Defendants Quartzburg Gold, LP, ISR Capital, LLC and Idaho State Regional Center. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM) Modified on 2/12/2018 to correct typo (PM).
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND STIPULATED MOTION AND ORDER TO STRIKE CASE SCHEDULE AND TRIAL DATE re parties' 89 Joint Stipulated MOTION. PURSUANT TO STIPULATION, IT IS SO ORDERED. The case schedule and trial date in this case are hereby stricken. The Parties are directed to submit a further joint status report together with a proposed case schedule within ninety (90) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting plaintiff Xinyuan Mu's 86 Motion to Substitute and Withdraw Attorneys signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting defendant U.S. Bank's 14 Motion to Dismiss by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mao et al v. US Bank National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rui Mao
Represented By: Michael D. Black(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Rita M. Cornish(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Steven O Fortney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zhen Fan
Represented By: Michael D. Black(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Rita M. Cornish(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Steven O Fortney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wenlan Huang
Represented By: Michael D. Black(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Rita M. Cornish(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Steven O Fortney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shuangyan Jia
Represented By: Michael D. Black(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Rita M. Cornish(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Steven O Fortney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tieyin Li
Represented By: Michael D. Black(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Rita M. Cornish(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Steven O Fortney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huaijin Liu
Represented By: Michael D. Black(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Rita M. Cornish(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Steven O Fortney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zhicui Shan
Represented By: Michael D. Black(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Rita M. Cornish(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Steven O Fortney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yao Song
Represented By: Michael D. Black(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Rita M. Cornish(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Steven O Fortney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hailan Tang
Represented By: Michael D. Black(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Rita M. Cornish(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Steven O Fortney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haitao Xu
Represented By: Michael D. Black(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Rita M. Cornish(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Steven O Fortney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiuqin Yang
Represented By: Michael D. Black(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Rita M. Cornish(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Steven O Fortney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zhaohui Ye
Represented By: Michael D. Black(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Rita M. Cornish(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Steven O Fortney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Junhong Zhang
Represented By: Michael D. Black(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Rita M. Cornish(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Steven O Fortney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianyi Zhou
Represented By: Michael D. Black(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Rita M. Cornish(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Steven O Fortney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jia Yin Zhu
Represented By: Michael D. Black(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Rita M. Cornish(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Steven O Fortney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qingbin Bu
Represented By: Michael D. Black(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Rita M. Cornish(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Steven O Fortney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rui Fan
Represented By: Michael D. Black(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Rita M. Cornish(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Steven O Fortney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jiangang Han
Represented By: Michael D. Black(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Rita M. Cornish(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Steven O Fortney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bing Huang
Represented By: Michael D. Black(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Rita M. Cornish(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Steven O Fortney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zhongfa Liu
Represented By: Michael D. Black(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Rita M. Cornish(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Steven O Fortney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xinyuan Mu
Represented By: Michael D. Black(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Rita M. Cornish(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Steven O Fortney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peilin Wu
Represented By: Michael D. Black(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Rita M. Cornish(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Steven O Fortney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zhongmei Zhao
Represented By: Michael D. Black(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Rita M. Cornish(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Steven O Fortney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiaoyu Zhu
Represented By: Michael D. Black(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Rita M. Cornish(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Steven O Fortney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank National Association
Represented By: Peter S. Ehrlichman
Represented By: Shawn J Larsen-Bright
Represented By: Kimberly Neville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quartzburg Gold
Represented By: Thomas Matthew Brennan
Represented By: Krysta A Liveris
Represented By: Darwin L. Overson
Represented By: Eric B Swartz(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISR Capital
Represented By: Thomas Matthew Brennan
Represented By: Krysta A Liveris
Represented By: Darwin L. Overson
Represented By: Eric B Swartz(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idaho State Regional Center
Represented By: Thomas Matthew Brennan
Represented By: Krysta A Liveris
Represented By: Darwin L. Overson
Represented By: Eric B Swartz(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sima Muroff
Represented By: Thomas Matthew Brennan
Represented By: Krysta A Liveris
Represented By: Darwin L. Overson
Represented By: Eric B Swartz(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?