Allen et al v. Flight Services and Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ananais Allen and Austin Cloy
Defendant: Flight Services and Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv01137
Filed: July 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 53 Motion for Attorney Fees, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement re parties' 50 Stipulated Motion; Final Hearing set for 11/2/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15106, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATED ORDER allowing class members to opt-out of class action re parties' 45 Stipulated Motion, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting Defendant Flight Services and Systems, Inc.'s 32 Motion to Substitute Attorney, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (Added attorney Alan D Schuchman, Rochelle Y Nelson for Flight Services and Systems, Inc.; Attorney Gregory A McBroom terminated)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting parties' 36 Stipulated Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel and Representatives, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting parties' 33 Joint Motion to Continue Trial Date and Amend Case Schedule ; Jury Trial is CONTINUED to 9/6/2018, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(SWT)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying Motions for Continuance 22 , 27 ; plaintiffs' 13 Motion for class certification is renoted for 8/18/2017; Response due 8/14/2017, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER to modify briefing schedule on 13 MOTION to Certify Class; re parties' 18 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time; RENOTING 13 MOTION to Certify Class, Noting Date 7/14/2017. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen et al v. Flight Services and Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ananais Allen
Represented By: Duncan Calvert Turner
Represented By: Daniel R Whitmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Cloy
Represented By: Duncan Calvert Turner
Represented By: Daniel R Whitmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flight Services and Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory A McBroom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?