McLeod et al v. Valve Corporation et al
Plaintiff: McLeod, Samuel Joines, Sam Keller, J.J., A.D., Bradford Daniels, Dakota Barney, Isaac Lynn, William Garvin, G.G., Christopher Calvi, Nicholas Crain, Levi Ledbetter, Nicholas Durbin, Scott Hallman, Ryan Ford, Daniel Spann, Michael John McLeod, Jacob Phillips, C. B., Nicholas Mora, P.L., Jacob Williard, Jayme Reed, K.M., L.O., Aaron Ecker, Peter Kamenkovich, P.S., Daniel Kim, G.L., A.L., N.M., C. D., L.L., Ryan Klimt, Michael Allphin, Vincent Cianfaglione, Jared Conley, Dylan Latvis, Timothy Woelper, G.M., Rahul Malhotra, Justin Chandler, B. S., Andrew Punzak, S.S., Skyler Schuman, Dominic Allen, Kevin Ryan, Jake Bohl and Mitchell Gunter
Defendant: Valve Corporation, Thomas Cassell, James Varga, CSGOShuffle, Trevor A. Martin, PhantomL0rd, Inc., OPSkins Group, Inc. and CSGOLotto Inc
Case Number: 2:2016cv01227
Filed: August 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour denying Defendants CSGO Lotto Inc. and Trevor A. Martin's #41 Motion for Attorney Fees. (PM)
November 22, 2016 Filing 47 AMENDED JUDGMENT BY COURT; The Court dismissed Plaintiffs' RICO claim with prejudice for failure to state a claim. The remaining state law claims are also dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (PM)
November 22, 2016 Filing 46 AMNEDED ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour granting Defendants CSGO Lotto, Inc. and Trevor A. Martin's #19 MOTION to dismiss. Defendant Valve Corporation's motion to compel arbitration (Dkt. No. #21 ) is denied as moot. (PM)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour granting Plaintiffs' #40 Motion to alter, vacate, or amend the judgment. The Court's order on the motion to dismiss and judgment shall be amended to dismiss the state law claims without prejudice. (PM)
November 4, 2016 Filing 44 REPLY, filed by Defendants CSGOLotto Inc, Trevor A. Martin, TO RESPONSE to #41 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Watson, Coleman)
October 31, 2016 Filing 43 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs A.D., A.L., Dominic Allen, Michael Allphin, C. B., Dakota Barney, Jake Bohl, Christopher Calvi, Justin Chandler, Vincent Cianfaglione, Jared Conley, Nicholas Crain, C. D., Bradford Daniels, Nicholas Durbin, Aaron Ecker, Ryan Ford, G.G., G.L., G.M., William Garvin, Mitchell Gunter, Scott Hallman, J.J., Samuel Joines, K.M., K.M., Peter Kamenkovich, Sam Keller, Daniel Kim, Ryan Klimt, L.L., L.O., Dylan Latvis, Levi Ledbetter, Isaac Lynn, Rahul Malhotra, Michael John McLeod, Nicholas Mora, N.M., P.L., P.S., Jacob Phillips, Andrew Punzak, Jayme Reed, Kevin Ryan, B. S., S.S., Skyler Schuman, Daniel Spann, Jacob Williard, Timothy Woelper, to #41 MOTION for Attorney Fees . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Motion for Fees)(Stephens, Kim)
October 18, 2016 Filing 42 DECLARATION of Coleman W. Watson, Esq. filed by Defendants CSGOLotto Inc, Trevor A. Martin re #41 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Watson, Coleman)
October 18, 2016 Filing 41 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Defendants CSGOLotto Inc, Trevor A. Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) Noting Date 11/4/2016, (Watson, Coleman)
October 10, 2016 Filing 40 MOTION to Alter, Vacate or Amend Judgment Dismissing Claims with Prejudice re #39 Judgment by Court, #38 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion to Compel, by Plaintiffs A.D., A.L., Dominic Allen, Michael Allphin, C. B., Dakota Barney, Jake Bohl, Christopher Calvi, Justin Chandler, Vincent Cianfaglione, Jared Conley, Nicholas Crain, C. D., Bradford Daniels, Nicholas Durbin, Aaron Ecker, Ryan Ford, G.G., G.L., G.M., William Garvin, Mitchell Gunter, Scott Hallman, J.J., Samuel Joines, K.M., K.M., Peter Kamenkovich, Sam Keller, Daniel Kim, Ryan Klimt, L.L., L.O., Dylan Latvis, Levi Ledbetter, Isaac Lynn, Rahul Malhotra, Michael John McLeod, Nicholas Mora, N.M., P.L., P.S., Jacob Phillips, Andrew Punzak, Jayme Reed, Kevin Ryan, B. S., S.S., Skyler Schuman, Daniel Spann, Jacob Williard, Timothy Woelper. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/28/2016, (Stephens, Kim)
October 4, 2016 Filing 39 JUDGMENT BY COURT; The Court dismissed Plaintiffs' RICO claim with prejudice for failure to state a claim. The remaining state law claims are also dismissed with prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (PM)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour granting Defendants CSGO Lotto and Trevor A. Martin's #19 Motion to Dismiss. The first amended complaint #11 is dismissed with prejudice in its entirety. Defendant Valve Corporation's #21 Motion to Compel is denied as moot. (PM)
September 26, 2016 Filing 37 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #36 Reply to Response to Motion by Defendant Valve Corporation (Skok, Gavin)
September 23, 2016 Filing 36 REPLY, filed by Defendant Valve Corporation, TO RESPONSE to #21 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Skok, Gavin)
September 23, 2016 Filing 35 DECLARATION of Trevor A. Martin (Supplemental) filed by Defendants CSGOLotto Inc, Trevor A. Martin re #19 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint (Watson, Coleman)
September 23, 2016 Filing 34 DECLARATION of Aaron Vick (Supplemental) filed by Defendants CSGOLotto Inc, Trevor A. Martin re #19 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint (Watson, Coleman)
September 23, 2016 Filing 33 REPLY, filed by Defendants CSGOLotto Inc, Trevor A. Martin, TO RESPONSE to #19 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint (Watson, Coleman)
September 19, 2016 Filing 32 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs A.D., A.L., Dominic Allen, Michael Allphin, C. B., Dakota Barney, Jake Bohl, Christopher Calvi, Justin Chandler, Vincent Cianfaglione, Jared Conley, Nicholas Crain, C. D., Bradford Daniels, Nicholas Durbin, Aaron Ecker, Ryan Ford, G.G., G.L., G.M., William Garvin, Mitchell Gunter, Scott Hallman, J.J., Samuel Joines, K.M., K.M., Peter Kamenkovich, Sam Keller, Daniel Kim, Ryan Klimt, L.L., L.O., Dylan Latvis, Levi Ledbetter, Isaac Lynn, Rahul Malhotra, Michael John McLeod, Nicholas Mora, N.M., P.L., P.S., Jacob Phillips, Andrew Punzak, Jayme Reed, Kevin Ryan, B. S., S.S., Skyler Schuman, Daniel Spann, Jacob Williard, Timothy Woelper, to #21 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stephens, Kim)
September 19, 2016 Filing 31 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs A.D., A.L., Dominic Allen, Michael Allphin, C. B., Dakota Barney, Jake Bohl, Christopher Calvi, Justin Chandler, Vincent Cianfaglione, Jared Conley, Nicholas Crain, C. D., Bradford Daniels, Nicholas Durbin, Aaron Ecker, Ryan Ford, G.G., G.L., G.M., William Garvin, Mitchell Gunter, Scott Hallman, J.J., Samuel Joines, K.M., K.M., Peter Kamenkovich, Sam Keller, Daniel Kim, Ryan Klimt, L.L., L.O., Dylan Latvis, Levi Ledbetter, Isaac Lynn, Rahul Malhotra, Michael John McLeod, Nicholas Mora, N.M., P.L., P.S., Jacob Phillips, Andrew Punzak, Jayme Reed, Kevin Ryan, B. S., S.S., Skyler Schuman, Daniel Spann, Jacob Williard, Timothy Woelper, to #19 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint. Oral Argument Requested. (Stephens, Kim)
September 16, 2016 Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour granting Plaintiff's unopposed #25 Motion for leave to file an over-length brief re motion to dismiss and granting Plaintiff's #27 Motion for leave to file an over-length brief re motion to compel arbitration. (PM)
September 16, 2016 NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The #29 Notice of Appearance filed on 9/15/2016 was improperly signed by RYAN P. FORD. As such, Mr. Ford was not added to the case and will not receive future notices until corrected. Pursuant to FRCP Rule 11 and LCR 83.2(a), signatures must comply with Section III(L) of the Electronic Filing Procedures, which states, "An electronically filed pleading or other document which requires an attorney's signature must have the signors' names printed or typed on the line and under all signature lines." This deficiency may be corrected by filing a Notice of Appearance adhering to the Electronic Filing Procedures. Thank you. (PM)
September 15, 2016 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Paul E Fogarty on behalf of Defendants PhantomlOrd, Inc., James Varga. (Fogarty, Paul)
September 15, 2016 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Jason T. Dennett in Support of Motion for Leave to File an Over-Length Brief in Opposition to Valve Corporation's Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Plaintiffs A.D., A.L., Dominic Allen, Michael Allphin, C. B., Dakota Barney, Jake Bohl, Christopher Calvi, Justin Chandler, Vincent Cianfaglione, Jared Conley, Nicholas Crain, C. D., Bradford Daniels, Nicholas Durbin, Aaron Ecker, Ryan Ford, G.G., G.L., G.M., William Garvin, Mitchell Gunter, Scott Hallman, J.J., Samuel Joines, K.M., K.M., Peter Kamenkovich, Sam Keller, Daniel Kim, Ryan Klimt, L.L., L.O., Dylan Latvis, Levi Ledbetter, Isaac Lynn, Rahul Malhotra, Michael John McLeod, Nicholas Mora, N.M., P.L., P.S., Jacob Phillips, Andrew Punzak, Jayme Reed, Kevin Ryan, B. S., S.S., Skyler Schuman, Daniel Spann, Jacob Williard, Timothy Woelper re #27 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File an Over-Length Brief in Opposition to Valve Corporation's Motion to Compel Arbitration (Stephens, Kim)
September 15, 2016 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File an Over-Length Brief in Opposition to Valve Corporation's Motion to Compel Arbitration by Plaintiffs A.D., A.L., Dominic Allen, Michael Allphin, C. B., Dakota Barney, Jake Bohl, Christopher Calvi, Justin Chandler, Vincent Cianfaglione, Jared Conley, Nicholas Crain, C. D., Bradford Daniels, Nicholas Durbin, Aaron Ecker, Ryan Ford, G.G., G.L., G.M., William Garvin, Mitchell Gunter, Scott Hallman, J.J., Samuel Joines, K.M., K.M., Peter Kamenkovich, Sam Keller, Daniel Kim, Ryan Klimt, L.L., L.O., Dylan Latvis, Levi Ledbetter, Isaac Lynn, Rahul Malhotra, Michael John McLeod, Nicholas Mora, N.M., P.L., P.S., Jacob Phillips, Andrew Punzak, Jayme Reed, Kevin Ryan, B. S., S.S., Skyler Schuman, Daniel Spann, Jacob Williard. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/15/2016, (Stephens, Kim)
September 15, 2016 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Jason T. Dennett in Support of Motion for Leave to File an Over-Length Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs A.D., A.L., Dominic Allen, Michael Allphin, C. B., Dakota Barney, Jake Bohl, Christopher Calvi, Justin Chandler, Vincent Cianfaglione, Jared Conley, Nicholas Crain, C. D., Bradford Daniels, Nicholas Durbin, Aaron Ecker, Ryan Ford, G.G., G.L., G.M., William Garvin, Mitchell Gunter, Scott Hallman, J.J., Samuel Joines, K.M., K.M., Peter Kamenkovich, Sam Keller, Daniel Kim, Ryan Klimt, L.L., L.O., Dylan Latvis, Levi Ledbetter, Isaac Lynn, Rahul Malhotra, Michael John McLeod, Nicholas Mora, N.M., P.L., P.S., Jacob Phillips, Andrew Punzak, Jayme Reed, Kevin Ryan, B. S., S.S., Skyler Schuman, Daniel Spann, Jacob Williard, Timothy Woelper re #25 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File an Over-Length Brief In Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Stephens, Kim)
September 15, 2016 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File an Over-Length Brief In Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/15/2016, (Stephens, Kim) Modified on 9/16/2016 to condense text by removing individual plaintiffs names(PM).
September 6, 2016 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Trevor A. Martin filed by Defendants CSGOLotto Inc, Trevor A. Martin re #19 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint (Watson, Coleman)
September 1, 2016 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Christopher Boyd in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Valve Corporation re #21 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H - Part 1, #9 Exhibit H - Part 2)(Skok, Gavin)
September 1, 2016 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Gavin W. Skok in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Valve Corporation re #21 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Skok, Gavin)
September 1, 2016 Filing 21 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Defendant Valve Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/23/2016, (Skok, Gavin)
September 1, 2016 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Aaron Vick filed by Defendants CSGOLotto Inc, Trevor A. Martin re #19 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint (Watson, Coleman)
September 1, 2016 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint by Defendants CSGOLotto Inc, Trevor A. Martin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/23/2016, (Watson, Coleman)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #17 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Paul C. Whalen for Plaintiffs A.D., A.L., Dominic Allen, Michael Allphin, C. B., Dakota Barney, Jake Bohl, Christopher Calvi, Justin Chandler, Vincent Cianfaglione, Jared Conley, Nicholas Crain, C. D., Bradford Daniels, Nicholas Durbin, Aaron Ecker, Ryan Ford, G.G., G.L., G.M., William Garvin, Mitchell Gunter, Scott Hallman, J.J., Samuel Joines, K.M., K.M., Peter Kamenkovich, Sam Keller, Daniel Kim, Ryan Klimt, L.L., L.O., Dylan Latvis, Levi Ledbetter, Isaac Lynn, Rahul Malhotra, Michael John McLeod, Nicholas Mora, N.M., P.L., P.S., Jacob Phillips, Andrew Punzak, Jayme Reed, Kevin Ryan, B. S., S.S., Skyler Schuman, Daniel Spann, Jacob Williard, Timothy Woelper by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 31, 2016 Filing 17 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Paul C. Whalen FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs A.D., A.L., Dominic Allen, Michael Allphin, C. B., Dakota Barney, Jake Bohl, Christopher Calvi, Justin Chandler, Vincent Cianfaglione, Jared Conley, Nicholas Crain, C. D., Bradford Daniels, Nicholas Durbin, Aaron Ecker, Ryan Ford, G.G., G.L., G.M., William Garvin, Mitchell Gunter, Scott Hallman, J.J., Samuel Joines, K.M., K.M., Peter Kamenkovich, Sam Keller, Daniel Kim, Ryan Klimt, L.L., L.O., Dylan Latvis, Levi Ledbetter, Isaac Lynn, Rahul Malhotra, Michael John McLeod, Nicholas Mora, N.M., P.L., P.S., Jacob Phillips, Andrew Punzak, Jayme Reed, Kevin Ryan, B. S., S.S., Skyler Schuman, Daniel Spann, Jacob Williard, Timothy Woelper (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4584235 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Stephens, Kim)
August 18, 2016 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by CSGOLotto Inc (Wong, Ada)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #13 #14 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Coleman Watson for CSGOLotto Inc, and for Trevor A. Martin, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 18, 2016 Filing 14 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Coleman Watson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Defendants CSGOLotto Inc, Trevor A. Martin Receipt No. 0981-4568705 (Wong, Ada)
August 18, 2016 Filing 13 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Coleman Watson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants CSGOLotto Inc, Trevor A. Martin (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4568705 (Wong, Ada)
August 18, 2016 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ada Ko Wong on behalf of Defendants CSGOLotto Inc, Trevor A. Martin. (Wong, Ada)
August 16, 2016 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint for Damages against defendant(s) All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Jared Conley, Kevin Ryan, Andrew Punzak, Michael John McLeod, Christopher Calvi, L.L., Timothy Woelper, Samuel Joines, Jake Bohl, Jacob Williard, G.G., Ryan Klimt, Nicholas Mora, Bradford Daniels, K.M., Levi Ledbetter, P.L., Justin Chandler, G.L., Mitchell Gunter, G.M., P.S., K.M.(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), J.J., Dominic Allen, L.O., Ryan Ford, N.M., Dylan Latvis, Michael Alphin, A.D., Nicholas Crain, Scott Hallman, S.S., Rahul Malhotra, A.L., Daniel Spann, Peter Kamenkovich, Jacob Phillips, Dakota Barney, Isaac Lynn, Vincent Cianfaglione, Sam Keller, Daniel Kim, B. S., Nicholas Durbin, Aaron Ecker, Jayme Reed, C. D., C. B., William Garvin, Skyler Schuman.(Stephens, Kim)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jasper D. Ward for All Plaintiffs by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 12, 2016 Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jasper D. Ward IV FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Michael John McLeod (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4562168 (Stephens, Kim)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Charles B Casper for Valve Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 11, 2016 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Charles B. Casper FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Valve Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4560111 (Skok, Gavin)
August 9, 2016 Attorneys Shata L. Stucky and James Harlan Wendell for Valve Corporation added; per #3 Notice of Appearance. (CDA)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
August 9, 2016 Filing 5 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. The nature of the case; 2. The status of matters which are presently set before the Court, e.g., hearings, motions, etc.; 3. The status of discovery and a time schedule for its completion; 4. A statement of any legal issues about which motions are contemplated and a possible briefing schedule; 5. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 6. Whether the case is jury or non-jury; 7. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 8. Settlement probabilities; and 9. Whether the parties consent to proceed to trial before an assigned magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, arrangements may be made to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Paul_Pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) days prior to the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk, as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is set for 11/15/2016 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
August 8, 2016 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Valve Corporation (Skok, Gavin)
August 8, 2016 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Gavin William Skok on behalf of Defendant Valve Corporation. (Skok, Gavin)
August 5, 2016 Filing 2 Summons(es) electronically issued as to defendant(s) Valve Corporation, CSGOLotto, OPSkins Group Inc, James Varga, PhantomL0rd Inc, CSGOShuffle, Trevor A. Martin, Thomas Cassell. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(DJ)
August 5, 2016 U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (DJ)
August 4, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-4552364), filed by NM, Jared Conley, Kevin Ryan, PL, Andrew Punzak, Michael John McLeod, Christopher Calvi, Timothy Woelper, KM, Samuel Joines, Jake Bohl, Jacob Williard, Ryan Klimt, Nicholas Mora, Bradford Daniels, GM, AD, GL, SS, Levi Ledbetter, Justin Chandler, Mitchell Gunter, AL, JJ, PS, Dominic Allen, Ryan Ford, GG, Dylan Latvis, Michael Alphin, Nicholas Crain, Scott Hallman, LL, LO, Rahul Malhotra, Daniel Spann, Peter Kamenkovich, Jacob Phillips, Dakota Barney, Isaac Lynn, Vincent Cianfaglione, Sam Keller, Daniel Kim. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(Stephens, Kim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McLeod et al v. Valve Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valve Corporation
Represented By: Shata L. Stucky
Represented By: Gavin William Skok
Represented By: Charles B Casper
Represented By: James Harlan Wendell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Cassell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Varga
Represented By: Paul E Fogarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSGOShuffle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevor A. Martin
Represented By: Coleman Watson
Represented By: Ada Ko Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PhantomL0rd, Inc.
Represented By: Paul E Fogarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPSkins Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSGOLotto Inc
Represented By: Coleman Watson
Represented By: Ada Ko Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Joines
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Keller
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.J.
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.D.
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradford Daniels
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dakota Barney
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac Lynn
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Garvin
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.G.
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Calvi
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Crain
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levi Ledbetter
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Durbin
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Hallman
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Ford
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Spann
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael John McLeod
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Phillips
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. B.
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Mora
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P.L.
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Williard
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayme Reed
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.M.
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.O.
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Ecker
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Kamenkovich
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P.S.
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Kim
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.L.
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.L.
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.M.
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. D.
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.L.
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Klimt
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Allphin
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Cianfaglione
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Conley
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dylan Latvis
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Woelper
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.M.
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rahul Malhotra
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Chandler
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B. S.
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Punzak
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.S.
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skyler Schuman
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominic Allen
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Ryan
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jake Bohl
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Gunter
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Paul C. Whalen
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?