Duenez v. Dakota Creek Industries Inc
Plaintiff: Silvestre Duenez
Defendant: Dakota Creek Industries Inc
Case Number: 2:2016cv01238
Filed: August 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Skagit
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 39 Stipulated MOTION and Order of Dismissal. This action is DISMISSED with prejudice and without an award of costs or attorney fees to either party. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER re telephonic notice of settlement from Plaintiff's counsel; Plaintiff to file a stipulated dismissal or voluntary dismissal within 30 days of the issuance of this order; directing Clerk to terminate all pending management dates and close case for statistical purposes. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Plaintiff's 23 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and DENIES Plaintiff's 28 motion to strike. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 21 Stipulated Motion TO EXTEND THE LCR 39.1 MEDIATION DEADLINE. The parties shall conduct mediation no later than February 1, 2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 14 Motion to Compel signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duenez v. Dakota Creek Industries Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silvestre Duenez
Represented By: Scott Crispin Greco Blankenship
Represented By: Richard E. Goldsworthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dakota Creek Industries Inc
Represented By: Rodney Q. Fonda
Represented By: John prLee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?