Hudson Insurance Company v. Maniilaq Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Hudson Insurance Company
Defendant: Maniilaq Services, LLC and Maniilaq Association
Case Number: 2:2016cv01293
Filed: August 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER dismissing this action without prejudice and without an award of costs or attorney fees to either party re parties' 31 Stipulation. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 28 Stipulated Motion to reset the status conference. The Status Conference is reset for 4/11/2017 at 09:00 AM before U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. No further continuances will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 25 stipulated motion to reset status conference; Status Conference is RESET for Tuesday, 3/21/2017, at 09:00 AM before U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hudson Insurance Company v. Maniilaq Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hudson Insurance Company
Represented By: Todd W. Blischke
Represented By: Meredith E Dishaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maniilaq Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maniilaq Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?