Brown v. King County Jail et al
Plaintiff: Dranoel Enaj Brown
Defendant: King County Jail and State of Washington
Case Number: 2:2016cv01332
Filed: August 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Presiding Judge: James P. Donohue
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER ADOPTING 124 Report and Recommendation. Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 92 ) is GRANTED; Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice; Defendants' motions to strike (Dkt. Nos. 92 , 117 ) are GRANTE D as to Docket Numbers 62 , 66-71, 86 , 87 , and 116 and DENIED as to Docket Number 66 ; Plaintiff's motion to proceed to trial (Dkt. No. 90 ) is DENIED as moot; Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to respond to Defendants� 39; summary judgment motion (Dkt. No. 111 ) is DENIED as moot; Plaintiff's motion for discovery (Dkt. No. 119 ) is STRICKEN; and Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction (Dkt. No. 121 ) is DENIED as moot. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Dranoel Brown, Prisoner ID: 314960)(TH)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by 1st Class Mail; mailed on 11/8/2017 to Nancy Ledgerwood; General Order sent to Pltf. by Hon. James P. Donohue. **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Dranoel Brown, Prisoner ID: 314960)(TH)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by 1st Class Mail; mailed on 10/4/2017 to Kerry Maccini and David Pasoquen signed by Hon. James P. Donohue. **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Dranoel Brown, Prisoner ID: 314960)(PM)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 35 Motion to Compel Discovery; denying Plaintiff's third 36 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Hon. James P. Donohue. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Dranoel Brown, Prisoner ID: 314960)(PM)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER Discovery completed by 8/15/2017, Dispositive motions due by 9/15/2017, by Hon. James P. Donohue. **4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Dranoel Brown, Prisoner ID: 314960)(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. King County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dranoel Enaj Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?