DeLanoy v. Hal Nederland, N.V. et al
Plaintiff: Diana D. DeLanoy
Defendant: Hal Nederland NV, Hal Antillen NV, Holland America Line Inc, Holland America Line USA Inc and Holland America Line NV
Case Number: 2:2016cv01338
Filed: August 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Counsel having notified the Court of settlement of this case, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, IT IS ORDERED that this action and all claims asserted herein are DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs to any party. In the event that settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case within 60 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 17 Stipulated MOTION to Continue Trial Date and Related Dates: Jury Trial is set for 3/12/2018 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Expert Witness Disclosure due by 8/21/2017, Motions due by 10/12/2017, Discovery completed by 11/20/2017, Dispositive motions due by 12/21/2017, Motions in Limine due by 2/8/2018, Pretrial Order due by 2/23/2018, Pretrial Conference set for 3/2/2018 at 02:00 PM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Trial briefs to be submitted by 2/23/2018, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 2/23/2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER re parties' 15 Stipulation to Continue Expert Disclosure, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeLanoy v. Hal Nederland, N.V. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana D. DeLanoy
Represented By: Robert M. Kraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hal Nederland NV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hal Antillen NV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holland America Line Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holland America Line USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holland America Line NV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?