Skjold v. Glebe
Petitioner: Shane Skjold
Respondent: Pat Glebe
Case Number: 2:2016cv01349
Filed: August 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Presiding Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 22 Report and Recommendations; dismissing federal habeas action, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Shane Skjold, Prisoner ID: 748218)(SWT)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting Plaintiff Additional Extension of Time to Respond; re Plaintiff's 23 Letter, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Shane Skjold, Prisoner ID: 748218)(SWT)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler granting Petitioner's 20 Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioner's response to respondent's answer due by 3/27/2017. Respondent's answer 14 , 16 is RENOTED for 3/31/2017. Respondent shall file any reply brief in support of his answer by that date. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Shane Skjold, Prisoner ID: 748218)(PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skjold v. Glebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shane Skjold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Pat Glebe
Represented By: Mandy Lynn Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?