Aurora v. Sheely
Plaintiff: Aurora
Defendant: Patrick Allen Sheely
Case Number: 2:2016cv01358
Filed: August 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 52 Motion to Dismiss. It is Ordered that all claims be dismissed with prejudice and without costs to any party. The $3,000 attachment bond number SAIFSU0711199 filed with this court on November 22, 2016 (Dkt. # 13 ) is hereby exonerated. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM) cc: defendant via first class mail
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directing parties to show cause within seven (7) days of this order as to why this matter stay should not be lifted; why Plaintiff's motion for judgment 43 should not be replaced on this Court's motion calendar or why this case should not be closed. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM) cc: Patrick Sheely and Thomas Neeleman via U.S. Mail
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER STAYING CASE pending the outcome of Defendant's bankruptcy proceedings ; removing from Court's motion calendar pending 43 Motion for Judgment, by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT) (cc: Defendant, Defendant's counsel, Bankruptcy Trustee via USPS)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 36 Motion for Award of Statutory Damages. Defendant Sheely is liable to Plaintiff under 18 U.S.C. § 2255 for her personal injury(ies) in the statutory amount of $150,000.00. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM) cc: pro se defendant via the U.S. Mail
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 18 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Chief Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Plaintiff's counsel shall make a god faith effort to meet and confer with Defendant regarding a damages hearing as set forth in this Order.(SSM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aurora v. Sheely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Allen Sheely
Represented By: David S Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aurora
Represented By: Carol Lynn Hepburn
Represented By: J William Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?