Jesse Engineering Company v. Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jesse Engineering Company
Defendant: Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2016cv01399
Filed: September 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal re parties' 48 Stipulated Motion, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION ORDER to extend FRCP 26(a)(2) Expert Disclosure Deadline re parties' 33 Stipulated Motion ; Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 9/22/2017, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, as to Defendant, within five days of the date of this Order, why he should not be sanctioned for failure to comply with Local Rule 10(3)(9), signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jesse Engineering Company v. Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Engineering Company
Represented By: Gregory L Harper
Represented By: Thomas M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas Lether
Represented By: Eric J Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?