Peoples Bank v. P/C Ambassador of the Lake et al
Plaintiff: Peoples Bank
Defendant: P/C Ambassador of the Lake, Salvatore Ragusa and Lana Stewart
Intervenor: Pacific Fiberglass, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv01403
Filed: September 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Whatcom
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:954
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER ON MOTION FOR FEES AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT 120 granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 109 Motion for fees. The court ORDERS that Peoples Bank is entitled to judgment against Mr. Ragusa, in personam, for $143,367.52, plus interest at $45.98 per day from November 27, 2017, through the date of entry of this judgment and until paid. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 STIPULATION AND ORDER directing Clerk to delete the 139 document filed on 1/16/2018 from the file in this case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to what issues, if any, remain for trial on February 26, 2018. Each party is directed to file a statement no longer than two (2) pages within ten days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting plaintiff's 96 Motion for Summary Judgment in rem and judgment foreclosing its preferred marine mortgage signed by Judge James L. Robart.(RS)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER directing USMO to permit Mr Ragusa to remove items by Judge James L. Robart. (RS) cc USMO
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting Plaintiff Peoples Bank's 78 Motion for Interlocutory Sale; DIRECTING the United States Marshal to institute a public auction of the Ambassador of the Lake no sooner than May 22, 2017; ORDERING parties to meet and confer regarding Mr. Ragusa's purported personal items; STRIKING Defendant Salvatore Ragusa's 85 Second Response, by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (cc USMO)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge James L. Robart denying without prejudice Defendant Salvatore Ragusa's 52 motion to amend answer and file a counterclaim. (PM)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER DENYING PETITION TO RELEASE VESSEL AND SETTING AMOUNT OF BOND 23 , 30 by Judge James L. Robart. ORDERED that defendant Salvatore Ragusa deposit a properly secured bond in the sum of $234,000.00 into the Registry of the Court on or before the close of business Wednesday, November 23, 2016. The clerk shall retain this deposit until directed to release it in full or in part by further Order. (PM) Modified on 11/18/2016: cc financial (PM).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peoples Bank v. P/C Ambassador of the Lake et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peoples Bank
Represented By: Charles Stanley Loosmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P/C Ambassador of the Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvatore Ragusa
Represented By: Jeff E Jared
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lana Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Pacific Fiberglass, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel A.S. Foe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?