King v. Whatcom County Deputies et al
Plaintiff: Robert L King
Defendant: Whatcom County Deputies, Bill Elfo and John Doe
Case Number: 2:2016cv01420
Filed: September 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Whatcom
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Presiding Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 48 Report and Recommendations, by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 41 Motion to Continue Deadlines. Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' 37 Motion for Summary Judgment is due 10/9/2017; Defendants' Reply due 10/13/2017. Plaintiff directed to notify the Court of any change of address within 10 days of the change. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert King, Prisoner ID: 353170)(PM)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying plaintiff's 35 Motion to void power of attorney without prejudice by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida.(RS) cc plaintiff
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying plaintiff's 26 Motion to Compel by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida.**4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert King, Prisoner ID: 353170)(RS)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Discovery completed by 5/22/2017, Dispositive motions due by 6/21/2017, **4 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert King, Prisoner ID: 353170) (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Whatcom County Deputies et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whatcom County Deputies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Elfo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?