Holmes et al v. Yct. Nova et al
Plaintiff: Robert Holmes and Marquis International Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Yct. Nova, Yct. M Squared, Stephen Yadvish, Yachtfish Marine, Inc. and S.B. Joseph Clark
Counter_claimant: Yachtfish Marine, Inc., Stephen Yadvish and S.B. Joseph Clark
Counter_defendant: Robert Holmes and Marquis International Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv01422
Filed: September 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MEMORANDUM OF DECISION signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of plaintiffs and against defendant. Each side will bear its own costs and fees. (PM)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER regarding plaintiffs' 93 -1 Second Motion in Limine. Plaintiffs' motion to exclude R. Bruce Johnston from testifying at trial is taken under advisement. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER denying defendant Clark's 90 Motion to Compel, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting plaintiffs' 93 Motion for Relief from Deadline, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER vacating 87 Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion in Limine; RENOTING Plaintiff's 79 MOTIONS IN LIMINE : Noting Date 4/13/2018, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 79 Motion in Limine signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TH)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal of Certain Claims with Prejudice re parties' 84 Stipulation, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (Stephen Yadvish (a married individual, and the marital community of Stephen Yadvish and Jody Frye, in personam) and Yachtfish Marine, Inc. terminated.)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting in part Defendants Yachtfish Marine, Inc. and Stephen Yadvish's 51 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER denying Defendant S.B. Joseph Clark's 63 Motion for Partial Stay or in the Alternative to Continue Trial, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting 55 Stipulated Motion to renote Clark's motion to exclude testimony of Darryl Heasley; 50 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Darryl Heasley is renoted to 6/16/2017, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER denying Defendant Stephen Yadvish's 37 Motion to Dismiss Individual Capacity Claims, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting 45 Unopposed Motion to Continue Deadlines, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Expert Disclosure deadline continued to 4/7/2017, Discovery deadline continued to 6/5/2017. (KERR)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting Chris P. Reilly's 34 Motion to withdraw as counsel of record. Attorney Chris P Reilly withdraws as counsel for defendants Stephen Yadvish and Yachtfish Marine, Inc. Yachtfish Marine, Inc., shall have twenty days in which to retain new counsel. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM) cc: copy of order emailed to seattle@yachtfishmarine.com; sent via USPS to defendants Stephen Yadvish and Yachtfish Marine, Inc.
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holmes et al v. Yct. Nova et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Holmes
Represented By: Drew Fitzgerald Duggan
Represented By: Jess Gilbert Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquis International Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Drew Fitzgerald Duggan
Represented By: Jess Gilbert Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yct. Nova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yct. M Squared
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Yadvish
Represented By: Chris P Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yachtfish Marine, Inc.
Represented By: Chris P Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.B. Joseph Clark
Represented By: John E. Casperson
Represented By: Heather C Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Yachtfish Marine, Inc.
Represented By: Chris P Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Stephen Yadvish
Represented By: Chris P Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: S.B. Joseph Clark
Represented By: John E. Casperson
Represented By: Heather C Cook
Represented By: John E. Casperson
Represented By: Heather C Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Robert Holmes
Represented By: Drew Fitzgerald Duggan
Represented By: Jess Gilbert Webster
Represented By: Drew Fitzgerald Duggan
Represented By: Jess Gilbert Webster
Represented By: Drew Fitzgerald Duggan
Represented By: Jess Gilbert Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Marquis International Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Drew Fitzgerald Duggan
Represented By: Jess Gilbert Webster
Represented By: Drew Fitzgerald Duggan
Represented By: Jess Gilbert Webster
Represented By: Drew Fitzgerald Duggan
Represented By: Jess Gilbert Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?