Sweeny v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Plaintiff: Juli Ann Sweeny
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv01424
Filed: September 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice re parties' 26 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AMENDED ORDER Setting Trial Date and Related Dates re parties' 22 Stipulated Motion ; Bench Trial is set for 2/5/2018 (3 days), Discovery completed by 10/8/2017, Dispositive motions due by 11/7/2017, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 8/2/2017, Motions in Limine due by 1/8/2018, Pretrial Order due by 1/24/2018, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 10/22/2017, Trial briefs to be submitted by 1/31/2018, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(SWT)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 19 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time; Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) extended to 7/5/2017, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 Stipulated Motion to Extend the Expert Witness Report Date; time extended from 5/10/2017 to 6/7/2017, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directing parties to file Joint Status Report by 2/8/2017, and show cause to the Court why sanctions including dismissal should not be imposed for their failure to comply with the Order of December 2, 2016 by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sweeny v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juli Ann Sweeny
Represented By: Craig Steven Sternberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Barbara L Bollero
Represented By: Ann T Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?