Tokarski v. Navient Solutions, Inc
Plaintiff: Kimberly Tokarski
Defendant: Navient Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv01436
Filed: September 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing action with prejudice re parties' 40 Stipulation, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 34 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant Navient Solutions, LLC, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (Attorney Taylor T Haywood and Nina Sue Whiston terminated)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting defendant's 32 34 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (Carolyn A. Pearson terminated) (Attorney Taylor T Haywood and Nina Sue Whiston terminated) Modified on 9/28/2017 to correct clerk's error linking order to wrong motion (SWT). (NEF regenerated)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 22 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; Plaintiff's proposed Amended Complaint attached as Exhibit "A" is hereby entered and incorporated into the record of this matter, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tokarski v. Navient Solutions, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Tokarski
Represented By: Richard J. Symmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navient Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?