Pallies v. The Boeing Company
Plaintiff: David Pallies
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Case Number: 2:2016cv01437
Filed: September 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Skagit
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER vacating 62 Judgment; denying as moot defendant's 64 Motion for Bill of Costs. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting in part plaintiff's 63 Motion for Reconsideration; REVERSING summary judgment as to whether or not Boeing made reasonable accommodations for plaintiff in terms of informing him of vacancies that opened after he was terminated. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER for Further Briefing; RENOTING plaintiff's 63 MOTION for Reconsideration: Noting Date 9/28/2018, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting Defendant's 35 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TH) (Main Document 61 replaced on 6/29/2018 to correct typo) (TH).
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 58 Stipulated Motion to Continue Trial and Extend Related Dates, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER denying plaintiff's 52 Motion for Reconsideration; granting plaintiff leave to file additional motion limited to deposition dispute on or before Thursday, October 5, 2017, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) ( 54 Motion to Amend terminated)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 20 Motion to Compel Discovery, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 17 Stipulated Motion to Continue Discovery Completion Date; Discovery to be completed by 6/19/2017, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pallies v. The Boeing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Pallies
Represented By: Matthew J Bean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Represented By: Laurence A Shapero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?