Roper et al v. BorgWarner Morse Tec Inc et al
Plaintiff: William Roper and Carol Roper
Defendant: BorgWarner Morse Tec, Inc, Brand Insulations, Inc, CBS Corporation, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc, Crane Co., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Fryer-Knowles Inc, General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps, Inc, Grinnell LLC, IMO Industries, Inc, Ingersoll-Rand Company, ITT Corporation, J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc, Lone Star Industries, Inc, Metalclad Insulation, LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Saberhagen Holdings, Inc, SB Decking, Inc, Schneider Electric USA, Inc, Thomas Dee Engineering Co Inc, Thorpe Insulation Co, Trane US, Inc and Zurn Industries LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv01453
Filed: September 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MINUTE ORDER striking as moot parties' 146 Stipulation and Proposed Order of Dismissal With Prejudice of Defendant Schneider Electric USA, Inc. AUthorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Counsel having notified the Court of settlement of this case, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, IT IS ORDERED that this action and all claims asserted herein are DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs to any party. In the event that settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case within 60 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 135 Motion to Amend the Complaint and to Substitute Party to Continue the Action for Deceased Plaintiff Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. Rule 15(a)(2) and Rule 25(a)(1). Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(a), Carol Roper is hereby substituted for deceased plaintiff William Roper as the Personal Representative of his Estate. Counsel is directed to e-file their Amended Complaint within seven (7) days of the date of this Minute Order. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal without Prejudice as to Defendant Lone Star Industries, Inc. only. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER to Continue the Expert Disclosure Deadline re parties' 114 ; Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) deadline EXTENDED to 8/14/2017, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 9/5/2017, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant BorgWarner Morse Tec, Inc. re parties' 109 Stipulation ; plaintiffs' claims against BorgWarner are dismissed with prejudice and without costs or attorney's fees to either party, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (BorgWarner Morse Tec, Inc terminated.)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal of Saberhagen Holdings, Inc. re parties' 107 Stipulation; plaintiffs' claims in this matter against specially-appearing defendant Saberhagen Holdings, Inc. are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party, reserving to plaintiffs their claims against all other parties, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)(Saberhagen Holdings, Inc. terminated.)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 STIPULATION AND ORDER re parties' 103 Stipulated Motion ; striking defendant Metalclad Insulation's 93 Motion for Summary Judgment ; Plaintiffs' claims against defendant Metalclad Insulation, LLC are dismissed with prejudice, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (Metalclad Insulation, LLC terminated)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 STIPULATION AND ORDER for dismissal of Thomas Dee Engineering Co. Inc; re parties' 101 Stipulation, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (Thomas Dee Engineering Co Inc terminated)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal of Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. re parties' 96 Stipulation; Plaintiffs' claims in this matter against Defendant Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice and without costs to either party, reserving to Plaintiffs their claims against all other parties, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. terminated)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal of Defendant Zurn Industries, LLC re parties' 95 Stipulation ; All claims against Defendant ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC are hereby dismissed without prejudice, and without costs to either party, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (Zurn Industries LLC terminated.) (SWT)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 STIPULATION AND ORDER re parties' 89 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendant J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc.; Plaintiffs' claims against defendant J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc. are dismissed without prejudice, reserving to plaintiffs their claims against all other parties, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc terminated.)(SWT)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly dismissing without prejudice Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant ITT LLC, f/k/a ITT Corporation. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roper et al v. BorgWarner Morse Tec Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Roper
Represented By: Tammy C Barcenilla(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Michael David Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Roper
Represented By: Tammy C Barcenilla(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Michael David Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BorgWarner Morse Tec, Inc
Represented By: Richard D Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brand Insulations, Inc
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: David A Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Barry Neal Mesher
Represented By: Brian D Zeringer
Represented By: Rebecca A Zotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks, Inc
Represented By: Timothy Kost Thorson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Ryan J Groshong
Represented By: G William Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Barry Neal Mesher
Represented By: Brian D Zeringer
Represented By: Rebecca A Zotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fryer-Knowles Inc
Represented By: T Arlen Rumsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Barry Neal Mesher
Represented By: Brian D Zeringer
Represented By: Rebecca A Zotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Inc
Represented By: Ronald C Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC
Represented By: Ronald C Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc
Represented By: James Edward Horne
Represented By: Michael Edward Ricketts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Represented By: Mark B Tuvim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Represented By: Ronald C Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc
Represented By: Michael Mackenzie Brown
Represented By: Katherine M. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lone Star Industries, Inc
Represented By: Howard (Terry) I. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation, LLC
Represented By: Katherine M. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard G Gawlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saberhagen Holdings, Inc
Represented By: Timothy Kost Thorson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SB Decking, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider Electric USA, Inc
Represented By: Barry Neal Mesher
Represented By: Rachel Tallon Reynolds
Represented By: Alice Coles Serko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Dee Engineering Co Inc
Represented By: Aaron P Riensche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thorpe Insulation Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane US, Inc
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Represented By: Mark B Tuvim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries LLC
Represented By: Jason H Daywitt
Represented By: John Michael Mattingly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?