Mainhouse Homeowners Association v. Allstate Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Mainhouse Homeowners Association
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty and Doe Insurance Companies 1-10
Case Number: 2:2016cv01457
Filed: September 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 50 Stipulated Motion for Dismissal. Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1) and LR 10(g), the parties stipulate that plaintiff's claims against defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company shall be dismissed with prejudice and without fees or costs awarded to either party. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing with prejudice Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Allstate Insurance Company re: 48 Stipulated Motion. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 42 Stipulated Motion to Set Additional Litigation Deadlines. The Court orders the following additional pre-trial deadlines: Discovery Cut-Off - 10/30/2017, Expert disclosures per CR 26(a)(2) - 9/6/2017, Supplemental expert disclosures - 10/6/2017, Deadline for Hearing Dispositive Motions - 12/1/2017, Deadline for filing Motions in Limine - 2/16/2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER to Consolidate by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. The Court hereby ORDERS that the following cases shall be consolidated: C16-1457-JCC and C17-0461-JCC. All future filings shall bear the caption and case number of the first-filed case, Mainhouse Homeowners Association v. Allstate Insurance Company, et al., C16-1457-JCC. (SWT)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 28 Motion to continue Defendant's motion for summary judgment. Clerk is directed to RENOTE Defendant's 24 Motion for partial summary judgment for 5/19/2017. Plaintiff's opposition due 5/15/2017; Defendant's reply due 5/19/2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendant's 10 Motion for Summary Judgment; plaintiff's request for leave to amend is granted; if plaintiff choses to amend complaint it must be filed within 30 days by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mainhouse Homeowners Association v. Allstate Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mainhouse Homeowners Association
Represented By: Jessica Burns
Represented By: Daniel S Houser
Represented By: Daniel Stein
Represented By: Jerry Stein
Represented By: Justin D Sudweeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Insurance Companies 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?