Roberts v. Snohomish County et al

Plaintiff: Joe J.W. Roberts, Jr.
Defendant: Snohomish County and Acheampong
Case Number: 2:2016cv01464
Filed: September 16, 2016
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Referring Judge: James P. Donohue
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 21, 2018 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 134 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re plaintiff's 142 Objections to Report and Recommendation; granting defendants' 99 Motion for Summary Judgment; dismissing this action with prejudice as to plaintiff's federal constitutional claims and without prejudice as to plaintiff's state law defamation claims, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Joe Roberts, Prisoner ID: 394089)(SWT)
February 12, 2018 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 124 Motion to Hold Defendants in Contempt; denying Plaintiff's 129 Motion to Appoint Counsel under the Americans with Disabilities Act, signed by Hon. James P. Donohue. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Joe Roberts, Prisoner ID: 394089)(SWT)
November 17, 2017 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiff's 112 Motion to Extend Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline, signed by Hon. James P. Donohue. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Joe Roberts, Prisoner ID: 394089)(SWT)
October 6, 2017 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiff's 103 Motion for Reconsideration ; granting in part plaintiff's 104 Motion to Stay; RENOTING defendants' 99 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Noting Date 12/1/2017, signed by Hon. James P. Donohue. **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Joe Roberts, Prisoner ID: 394089)(SWT)
August 10, 2017 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiff's 91 Motion regarding witness issues signed by Hon. James P. Donohue.**3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Joe Roberts, Prisoner ID: 394089)(RS)
June 14, 2017 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 76 Motion to Compel, signed by Hon. James P. Donohue. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Joe Roberts, Prisoner ID: 394089)(SWT)
May 19, 2017 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 67 Motion to have court order its own stenographer ; denying Plaintiff's 68 Motion to Compel ; granting Plaintiff's 69 Motion lost or destroyed legal documents during transfer ; denying Plaintiff's 70 Motion for Reconsideration, by Hon. James P. Donohue. **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Joe Roberts, Prisoner ID: 394089)(SWT)
May 4, 2017 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by 1st Class Mail; mailed on 5/4/2017 to Snohomish County Corrections Sergeant Otto, to Corrections Deputies E. Moormeier, Chavez, Cook, Ray, and Gilfeather, and to Nurse Meader; General Order sent to Pltf., by Hon. James P. Donohue. **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Joe Roberts, Prisoner ID: 394089)(SWT)
February 13, 2017 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiff's 24 Motion for Discovery; denying plaintiff's 26 Motion to Amend; granting defendants' 31 Motion to Quash Subpoena by Hon. James P. Donohue.**3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Joe Roberts, Prisoner ID: 394089)(RS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Snohomish County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe J.W. Roberts, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snohomish County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acheampong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?