Riggs v. Life Care Centers of America Inc
Plaintiff: Irene Riggs
Defendant: Life Care Centers of America Inc
Case Number: 2:2016cv01525
Filed: September 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 24 Motion for Leave of Court to Designate Expert. The discovery deadline is EXTENDED to September 29, 2017, for the sole purpose of taking Jan Youngs deposition. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to serve a copy of this Order on Jan Young and to file proof of such service within five (5) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part parties' 19 Stipulated Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Discovery deadline EXTENDED to 8/4/2017, Motions related to discovery due by 6/29/2017. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re parties' 17 Stipulation, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riggs v. Life Care Centers of America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene Riggs
Represented By: Gregory M Skidmore
Represented By: George O Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Care Centers of America Inc
Represented By: John T Bender
Represented By: Benjamin J Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?