National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA v Seattle School District No. 1
Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA
Defendant: Seattle School District No. 1
Case Number: 2:2016cv01534
Filed: September 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 JUDGMENT entered in favor of National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA against Seattle School District No. 1. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal of Counterclaims With Prejudice re parties' 51 Stipulation, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)(National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA (as counter defendant) and Seattle School District No. 1 (as counter claimant) terminated.)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 46 Stipulated Motion Extending Trial Date. The trial date of 6/18/2018 and all related deadlines are STRICKEN. Court will promptly reset the trial date, if appropriate, after it rules on 40 Motion for Summary Judgment. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part parties' 39 Stipulated Motion as follows: Jury Trial is CONTINUED to 6/18/2018 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Length of trial: 8-10 days; Dispositive motions due by 3/29/2018, Motio ns in Limine due by 5/17/2018, Pretrial Order due by 6/1/2018, Pretrial Conference set for 6/8/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Trial briefs to be submitted by 6/1/2018, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 6/1/2018, authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending deadline to file answer to first amended counterclaims re parties' 36 Stipulated Motion; Plaintiff has up to 1/9/2018 to answer defendant's first amended counterclaims, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 32 Stipulated Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and Responsive Pleadings. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 30 Stipulated Motion for Order Extending Deadlines and Continuing Trial Date : Jury Trial is set for 4/23/2018 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Discovery completed by 1/2/2018, Dispositive motions due by 2/1/2018, Motions in Limine due by 3/22/2018, Pretrial Order due by 4/6/2018, Pretrial Conference set for 4/13/2018 at 02:00 PM. Trial briefs to be submitted by 4/6/2018, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 4/6/2018, authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 28 Stipulated Motion for Bifucation and Stay of Certain Claims. Discovery in this action is hereby STAYED except with respect to those claims outlined in the parties stipulated motion. The deadline to file discovery motions is EXTENDED to 9/14/2017. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiff's 18 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA v Seattle School District No. 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA
Represented By: Sally Kim
Represented By: Donald J Verfurth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seattle School District No. 1
Represented By: Patricia Kay Buchanan
Represented By: Kevin J Kay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?