A.T. v. Everett School District et al
Plaintiff: A.T.
Defendant: Everett School District, Carol Whitehead and Craig Verver
Case Number: 2:2016cv01536
Filed: September 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting Defendant Everett School District's first 57 Motion for Summary Judgment and granting Defendant Craig Verver' s motion for summary judgment (Dkt. # 61). The court also denies the District's second motion for summary judgment (Dkt. # 59 ) as moot. Accordingly, the court dismisses this case with prejudice. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 39 Motion to Amend; granting Plaintiff's 41 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 49 Motion to Exclude. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER directing the District to respond to Plaintiff's 41 Motion to compel a response to Interrogatory No. 2 subject to the Local Rules for the WDWA. A.T. may file a reply by the noting date. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting parties' 37 Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadlines. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 9/29/2017, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting Defendant Verver's 12 Motion to dismiss Plaintiff A.T.'s complaint as untimely and grants A.T. leave to amend her complaint within 20 says of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.T. v. Everett School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.T.
Represented By: Darrell L Cochran
Represented By: Kevin M. Hastings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everett School District
Represented By: Charles P E Leitch
Represented By: Angela Marshlain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Whitehead
Represented By: Charles P E Leitch
Represented By: Angela Marshlain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Verver
Represented By: Michael J Andrews
Represented By: Mark Giuliano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?