June 9, 2023 |
Filing
289
ORDER: the Court STAYS this case, pending the Ninth Circuit's mandate in Carmona or Miller, whichever is issued later. The parties are hereby ORDERED, within fourteen (14) days of the later-filed Ninth Circuit mandate in Carmona or Miller to provide the Court with a joint status report. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SS)
|
January 30, 2023 |
Filing
261
ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 244 Motion to Amend. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to file an amended complaint within seven (7) days of this Order. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SS)
|
October 11, 2022 |
Filing
237
MINUTE ORDER re Parties' 235 Joint Status Report. The Court DIRECTS Defendants to submit an omnibus motion to compel, with an increased limit of 40 pages. Plaintiffs may also have 40 pages for their response brief. Defendants' repl y brief shall be no more than 20 pages. Deadline for Exchange of Initial Disclosure: 10/21/2022. Deadline to File Consolidated Complaint: 11/14/2022. Deadline to Answer or File Rule 12 Motion: 12/5/2022. Deadline for filing of Renewed Motion to Co mpel Arbitration: 2/24/2023. Deadline for filing of Class Certification Motion: 2/24/2023. Deadline for Completion of Fact & Expert Discovery: 180 days from the date of Class Certification Order. Deadline for Dispositive Motions: 30 days after close of discovery. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SR)
|
July 26, 2022 |
Filing
226
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' 201 Motion to Lift Stay. The stay is LIFTED for the limited purpose of resolving two threshold issues: 1) the appointment of lead counsel and 2) how the consolidated cases in this matter should proceed. The parties are ORDERED to meet and confer, and to submit a joint status report by Friday, 8/19/2022. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SR)
|
July 8, 2022 |
Filing
223
MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiffs' 220 MOTION to Certify Class. Defendants' 222 MOTION for Relief from Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion Class Certification is denied as moot. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SR)
|
June 16, 2022 |
Filing
200
ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES: The Clerk is DIRECTED to consolidate case numbers C19-1719-JCC, C19-1718-JCC, C21-0419-JCC, and C21-1370 into case number C16- 1554-JCC. All future pleadings shall bear the case number C16-1554-JCC. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SR)
|
February 14, 2022 |
Filing
194
ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiffs' 185 MOTION for Class Certification. Plaintiffs may refile their motion once the Court lifts the stay. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SR)
|
January 7, 2022 |
Filing
193
ORDER: Plaintiff Mack's motion (Dkt. No. 165 ) is DENIED in its entirety, Defendants' cross-motion (Dkt. No. 170 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED as moot in part, and Defendants' motion to continue the stay pending the Supreme Court's final decisions in Southwest Airlines Co. v. Saxon, No. 21-309, and Viking River Cruises v. Moriana, No. 20-1573. (Dkt. No. 186 ) is GRANTED. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SR)
|
December 23, 2021 |
Filing
190
MINUTE ORDER re Plaintiffs' 189 Request for Clarification. This action remains stayed; any changes to the existing stay shall be decided on the related motions. As indicated in the minute order (Dkt. No. 187 ), Defendants' deadline to respond to the third amended complaint shall be 21 days from the date the stay in this action is lifted. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SR)
|
December 20, 2021 |
Filing
187
MINUTE ORDER granting Parties' 174 Stipulated and Proposed Order to File Third Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs shall file their third amended complaint (Dkt. No. 174 -1) within 14 days of this order. Defendants' deadline to respond to the third amended complaint shall be 21 days from the date the stay in this action is lifted. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SR)
|
December 10, 2020 |
Filing
160
MINUTE ORDER: The Court DIRECTS the parties to file a joint status report within 21 days of the date of this order under Local Civil Rule 16 informing the Court of the most expeditious way to proceed to resolution of this action. The joint status report must include the parties' positions on whether the stay should be lifted and whether Ponce and Keller should be consolidated with this action. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (MW)
|
July 9, 2019 |
Filing
134
ORDER to Consolidate re Defendants' 126 MOTION to Consolidate Cases . The Clerk is directed to consolidate case number C19-cv-00498-JCC into case number C16-01554-JCC. All future pleadings shall bear the case number C16-01554-JCC. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
|
June 13, 2019 |
Filing
133
ORDER granting Defendants' 117 Motion to Extend Stay Pending Appeal signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
|
June 10, 2019 |
Filing
132
MINUTE ORDER to Consolidate. The Clerk is DIRECTED to consolidate case number Case No. C19-0398-JCC into case number C16-1554-JCC. All future pleadings shall bear the case number C16-1554-JCC. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
|
April 23, 2019 |
Filing
115
ORDER denying Defendants' 36 Motion to compel arbitration signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
|
March 29, 2019 |
Filing
113
MINUTE ORDER denying Defendants' 111 Request for Permission to File Brief Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
|
January 29, 2019 |
Filing
101
MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 100 Stipulated Motion and Order to Partially Lift Stay. The stay in this action shall be partially lifted for the limited purpose of resolving Defendants' motion to compel arbitration (Dkt. No. 36 ) . The parties shall file supplemental briefs on Defendants' motion to compel arbitration on or before 2/20/2019. The parties' response briefs are due on or before 3/6/2019. Furthermore, the Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the motion to lift stay (Dkt. No. 99 ) as moot. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
|
June 11, 2018 |
Filing
98
MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 94 Motion to Lift Stay authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
|
November 14, 2017 |
Filing
87
ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES re parties' 86 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Consolidating. The Clerk is DIRECTED to consolidate case number C17-1438-JCC into case number C16-1554-JCC. All future pleadings shall bear the case number C16-1554-JC C. Pursuant to the Court's order dated March 22, 2017 (Dkt. No. 77 ), the case will remain stayed until such time as the parties inform the Court that the Supreme Court has rendered its decision in Epic Systems Corp. v. Lewis (U.S. Jan. 13, 2017) (No. 16-285) or, following a Ninth Circuit decision in Van Dusen v. Swift Transp. Co., No. 17-15102 (9th Cir. Jan. 20, 2017). Defendants' deadline to respond to the complaint for the case previously assigned case number C17-1438-JCC (Iain Mack v. Amazon.com Inc.) will be fourteen (14) days after the stay is lifted. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
|
April 19, 2017 |
Filing
82
MINUTE ORDER dismissing as moot plaintiffs' 78 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying plaintiffs' 80 Motion for Reconsideration by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RS)
|
April 6, 2017 |
Filing
79
MINUTE ORDER directing Plaintiffs' to resubmit their 78 Motion for Reconsideration in conformity with the Local Civil Rules no later than 4/13/2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
|
March 22, 2017 |
Filing
77
ORDER granting Defendant Amazon's 71 Motion for stay of class and collective action proceedings. All proceedings are STAYED until further notice from the Court. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
|
March 6, 2017 |
Filing
76
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Amazon's 36 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs are granted leave to amend and must submit an amended complaint within 30 days of this order. Plaintiffs' motion to issue notice (Dkt. No. 20 ) is STAYED until further notice from the Court. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
|
January 18, 2017 |
Filing
61
MINUTE ORDER striking Plaintiffs' opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss 46 ; Plaintiffs shall submit an amended brief that conforms to the letter and spirit of the Local Civil Rules no later than January 27, 2017; Defendants' Re ply brief due 2/3/2017; Defendants' 36 motion to dismiss and Plaintiffs' 20 motion for notice to be issued are RENOTED to 2/3/2017; denying Defendants' 59 motion for leave to file an over-length reply. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
|