United States of America v. Wight et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Marjorie A. Wight, Matthew J. Migel, Wendy Wight, US Bank NA ND and King County Treasurer
Case Number: 2:2016cv01556
Filed: October 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:6502
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying the Government's 45 Motion for Reconsideration signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER OF SALE. The Court previously entered judgment following its order granting, in part, the United States' motion for summary judgment (Dkt. Nos. 43 , 44 ). The Order shall be held IN ABEYANCE during the life of Marjorie Wight, provided that she complies with the terms of her agreement with the United States. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MINUTE ORDER re Plaintiff's 45 MOTION for Reconsideration re 43 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court DIRECTS Mr. Migel to submit a response to Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration on or before July 6, 2018. Should Plai ntiff wish to submit a reply to Defendant's response, Plaintiff shall do so on or before July 13, 2018. The Clerk is DIRECTED to re-note Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration (Dkt. No. 45 ) for July 13, 2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting in part and denying in part the Government's 36 Motion for Summary Judgment. The conveyance to Mr. Migel is vacated as constructively fraudulent. The tax liens are foreclosed and the property shall be sold once Ms. Wight's life estate terminates. The Government is INSTRUCTED to submit an order of sale for Court approval. The Government's remaining claims are mooted by this ruling. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER re parties' 39 Stipulation and Order re Bank Lien Priority. The United States and U.S. Bank shall bear their own costs and fees associated with this issue. U.S. Bank is excused from further appearance in this matter, unless the Court orders otherwise. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 28 Motion to Strike Affirmative Defense for Lack of Jurisdiction. The Court STRIKES Defendant Marjorie Wight's innocent spouse defense. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 29 Status Report/Motion for Continuance: Status Conference set for 12/11/2018 is VACATED; Jury Trial is CONTINUED to 8/13/2018 at 09:30 AM before U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour; 39.1 mediation to be completed by 4/20/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 2/7/2018, Motions in Limine due by 7/11/2018, Pretrial Order due by 8/3/2018, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 8/6/2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 24 Stipulated Motion Vacate the Trial Schedule. Status Conference set for 12/12/2017 at 09:00 AM before U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Wight et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Guy P Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marjorie A. Wight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew J. Migel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Wight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank NA ND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County Treasurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?