DiNardo v. WOW 1 DAY Painting LLC
Plaintiff: Val DiNardo
Defendant: WOW 1 DAY Painting LLC
Counter_claimant: WOW 1 DAY Painting LLC
Counter_defendant: Val DiNardo
Case Number: 2:2016cv01600
Filed: October 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER dismissing Wow 1 Day Painting, LLC's counterclaims without prejudice. Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting Defendant's 35 Motion for Summary Judgment on all of Mr. DiNardo's claims. The court also ORDERS the parties to show cause why Wow's compulsory counterclaims should not be dismissed without prejudice. Show Cause Response due by 1/31/2018. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 31 Stipulated MOTION Regarding Discovery Dates. Discovery-related Motions due by 10/20/2017; Discovery cutoff extended to 11/20/2017, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER regarding parties' 31 Stipulated Motion to Extend Discovery and Discovery Motion; parties shall file a joint notice within two (2) days of the filing of this order indicating their agreement or lack of agreement to the court's condition, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DiNardo v. WOW 1 DAY Painting LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Val DiNardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WOW 1 DAY Painting LLC
Represented By: Bryan C Graff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: WOW 1 DAY Painting LLC
Represented By: Bryan C Graff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Val DiNardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?