BrandVerity Inc v. John Does 1-100

Plaintiff: BrandVerity Inc
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Case Number: 2:2016cv01616
Filed: October 14, 2016
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 18:1030
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2017 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending time for plaintiff to name and effectuate service on defendants by Judge James L. Robart. (RS)
April 28, 2017 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directing Plaintiff to show cause within seven (7) days why this action should not be dismissed for failure to comply with Rule 4(m). Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
December 21, 2016 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge James L. Robart directing Plaintiff Brandverity, Inc. to SHOW CAUSE by 1/6/2017, why the information is seeks from Comcast would be material evidence. Clerk directed to renote Brandverity's 7 Ex Parte motion for order regarding discovery from non-party Comcast Cable Communications, LLC for 1/6/2017. The court also DIRECTS Brandverity to provide Comcast with a copy of this order by 12/23/2016. (PM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BrandVerity Inc v. John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BrandVerity Inc
Represented By: Venkat Balasubramani
Represented By: Sean M. McChesney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?