Congdon v. Wells Fargo Bank NA
Plaintiff: Brenda Congdon
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Case Number: 2:2016cv01629
Filed: October 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 38 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(CDA)cc 9th Circuit via ECF
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 32 Motion to Alter or Amend the Judgment Pursuant to Rule 59(e), signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying plaintiff's 25 Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint; Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a second amended complaint is denied, and her claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting defendant's 19 motion to dismiss the first amended complaint, denying as moot defendant's first 8 motion to dismiss, granting defendant's first request 9 for judicial notice and denying defendant's second request 20 for judicial notice, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Plaintiff may file a motion to amend and attach a proposed pleading for the Court's consideration by Friday, March 17, 2017. (KERR) Modified on 2/17/2017 (KERR).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Congdon v. Wells Fargo Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Congdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: Rebecca R. Shrader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?