Kerrigan v. QBE Insurance Corporation
Plaintiff: Mary Ann Kerrigan
Defendant: QBE Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 2:2016cv01637
Filed: October 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting parties' 49 Stipulated Motion for withdrawal of Plaintiff's Counsel. Ian Franzel of Franzel Law, PLLC is hereby terminated as Counsel for the Plaintiff in this case. Plaintiff shall proceed pro se for any further activities in this matter. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(TH) (cc: Plaintiff via U.S. Mail)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting Defendant's 36 Motion for Summary Judgment. All ofPlaintiff Kerrigan's claims are DISMISSED. This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 45 Stipulated Motion of Continuance of Calendar Dates. Length of Trial: *2-3 Day*. Jury Trial is set for 4/2/2018 before Judge Ricardo S Martinez. Plaintiff's pretrial statement due 2/5/2018; Defendant's pretrial statement due 2/15/2018, Motions in Limine due by 2/26/2018, Agreed pretrial order due 3/14/2018, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs/ trial exhibits due by 3/19/2018. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 27 Motion to Continue; 2-3 day Jury Trial is set for 1/22/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S Martinez. Motions due by 8/1/2017, Discovery completed by 9/18/2017, Dispositive motions due by 10/16/2017, 39.1 Settlement Report due by 11/29/2017, Motions in Limine due by 12/16/2017, Pretrial Order due by 1/3/2018, Trial briefs to be submitted by 1/8/2018, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting defendant's 19 Motion to Compel by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS) Modified on 5/22/2017/cc plaintiff (RS).
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting plaintiff's 16 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ian Matthew Johnson terminated for plaintiff; clerk added plaintiff's pro se information on the docket by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS) cc Kerrigan
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER striking attorney Ian Matthew Johnson's 14 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel. Until Mr. Johnson withdraws in accordance with the Local Civil Rules, he shall continue as the attorney of record for Plaintiff. Authorized by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kerrigan v. QBE Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ann Kerrigan
Represented By: Ian Matthew Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBE Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Gabriel Baker
Represented By: Steven Douglas Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?