Lund v. United States Postal Service
Plaintiff: Garrett Lund
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Case Number: 2:2016cv01653
Filed: October 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending deadline to file motions in limine to 8/13/2018 re parties' 31 Stipulated Motion, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Reforming Caption re United States' 28 Notice, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (United States of America added. United States Postal Service terminated)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 14 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying defendant's 15 Motion for Summary Judgment; directing the Clerk to set this matter for trial. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Extension of Pretrial Deadlines; re parties' 12 Stipulated Motion; Rebuttal Expert Disclosure due by 11/17/2017, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure for Defendant's economist due by 12/22/2017, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 10 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Pretrial Deadlines. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 10/9/2017, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 11/3/2017, Discovery completed by 11/24/2017, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lund v. United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garrett Lund
Represented By: Christopher Lee Otorowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?