The Hanover Insurance Company v. Mehling et al
Plaintiff: The Hanover Insurance Company
Defendant: Cristina Mehling, John Doe Mehling, Mehling Law Firm PLLC and Virginia L Burdette
Case Number: 2:2016cv01671
Filed: October 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER denying Mehling Defendants' 44 Motion for Attorney Fees; striking as moot Hanover's 64 Motion to Strike Supplemental Reply and Supporting Declarations; striking as moot Hanover's 15 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; dismissing Hanover's remaining claims with prejudice and without costs, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)(cc: Gordon Tilden Thomas & Cordell LLP via USPS)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MINUTE ORDER dismissing plaintiff's claims against Trustee Virginia Burdette with prejudice and without costs ; striking as moot plaintiff's 32 Motion for Reconsideration ; LIFTING STAY and returning case to active docket ; RENOTING Defendants Cristina Mehling, Mehling Law Firm PLLC 44 Motion for Attorney's Fees : Noting Date 11/17/2017. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Gordon Tilden Thomas & Cordell LLP via USPS)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTE ORDER RE-NOTING Plaintiff's 32 MOTION for Reconsideration re 31 Order on Motion to Stay, Case Stayed, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings, and Defendants Mehling Law Firm PLLC and Cristina Mehling's 44 MOTION for Attorney Fees ; Noting Date 9/29/2017, Joint Status Report due by 9/29/2017. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH) (cc: Cristina Mehling via USPS)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 49 Stipulation; Susannah Carr and Matthew Pierce of Gordon Tilden Thomas & Cordell LLP are permitted to withdraw as counsel of record for defendants Cristina Mehling and Mehling Law Firm PLLC, effective immediately. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Cristina Mehling via USPS)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' 42 Surreply/Motion to Strike, portion of Plaintiff's 39 Reply indicating that plaintiff intends to seek leave to amend its complaint to assert a claim for rescission ; deferring and re-noting Plaintiff's 32 MOTION for Reconsideration : Noting Date 8/11/2017 ; directing parties to file a Joint Status Report due by 8/11/2017. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER RE-NOTING plaintiff's 32 MOTION for Reconsideration for 6/16/2017, defendants' response due 6/12/17, reply due by noting date by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (RS)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER denying in part and deferring in part plaintiff's 15 motion for judgment on the pleadings; granting the deferred portion of the Mehling defendants' 18 Motion to Stay; JSR due within 14 days after underlying litigation in King County Superior Court is completed or by 1/15/18; oral argument set for 5/12/17 at 10am is stricken by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(RS)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER Setting Hearing on Defendants' 18 MOTION to Stay, and Plaintiff's 15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings : Oral argument SET for Friday, 5/12/2017 at 10:00 AM. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER denying in part and deferring in part the Mehling Defendants' 18 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Underlying Lawsuit. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Hanover Insurance Company v. Mehling et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cristina Mehling
Represented By: Susannah Carr
Represented By: Matthew F Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Mehling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mehling Law Firm PLLC
Represented By: Susannah Carr
Represented By: Matthew F Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia L Burdette
Represented By: Paul E Fogarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Hanover Insurance Company
Represented By: George J Manos(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Gregory S Worden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?