Sia et al v. Airasia Berhad et al
Plaintiff: Henry Tanaya Sia and Theresia Tanaya Song
Defendant: Airasia Berhad, Honeywell International Inc, Goodrich Corporation, Danaher Corporation and Artus, S.A.S.
Case Number: 2:2016cv01692
Filed: November 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Counsel having advised the Court that this matter has been resolved, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs. In the event settlement is not perfected, either party may move to reopen and trial will be scheduled, provided such motion is filed within 60 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 87 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens; RENOTING defendants' 73 Joint MOTION to Dismiss For Forum Non Conveniens : Noting Date 3/2/2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 85 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; RENOTING defendants' 73 MOTION to Dismiss For Forum Non Conveniens : Noting Date 2/2/2018, authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 83 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report and Exchange Initial Disclosures; The deadline to file a Joint Status Report and exchange Initial Disclosures is extended from 11/27/2017 to thirty (30) days after the Court's ruling on defendants' motion to dismiss, docket no. 73 . Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 81 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time; RENOTING defendants' 73 Joint MOTION to Dismiss For Forum Non Conveniens : Noting Date 12/15/2017, authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MINUTE ORDER granting 79 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' 73 Joint Motion to Dismiss For Forum Non Conveniens is RENOTED for 11/17/2017. Response due 11/8/2017, Reply due on or before new noting date. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 77 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time; RENOTING Defendants' 73 Joint MOTION to Dismiss For Forum Non Conveniens : Noting Date 10/13/2017, Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 75 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time; RENOTING Defendants' 73 Joint Motion to Dismiss For Forum Non Conveniens : Noting Date 9/1/2017, authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting Defendant Artus, S.A.S' 50 Motion to Dismiss; granting Defendant Airasia Berhad 58 Motion to Dismiss; plaintiffs' claims against defendant Artus and defendant AirAsia Berhad are DISMISSED without prejudice, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting 62 Stipulated Motion for order relating to the motion to dismiss of dft Danaher Corporation; granting dft Danaher Corp's 47 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; pltfs granted leave to amend their complaint as to dft Danaher Corp within 30 days by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sia et al v. Airasia Berhad et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Tanaya Sia
Represented By: Cynthia B Jones
Represented By: Donald J Nolan(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas P Routh(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresia Tanaya Song
Represented By: Cynthia B Jones
Represented By: Donald J Nolan(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas P Routh(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airasia Berhad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc
Represented By: Marshall L Ferguson
Represented By: Douglas A Hofmann
Represented By: Charles Ingrassia(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Todd M Saranecki(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodrich Corporation
Represented By: Roberta Miranda(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Scott M Stickney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danaher Corporation
Represented By: Michael D Hunsinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Artus, S.A.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?