Head v. Disttech, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Romero Head and Romeo A. Head
Defendant: Disttech, Inc, Disttech, LLC, Jacques A. Wright and Jane Doe Wright
Case Number: 2:2016cv01727
Filed: November 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER re: parties' 130 Stipulated Motion for Order of Dismissal. It is ordered that Plaintiff's claims and causes of action in this matter are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND TO DISBURSE FUNDS re: Plaintiff's 117 Sealed Petition for Approval of Settlement. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 108 Unopposed Motion To Redact Certain Information From Pleadings Re: Minor Settlement; and Order to File Under Seal. Counsel for the parties and the court-appointed GALs may file pleadings with the settlement amount and the proposed disbursement amounts redacted, and are ORDERED to file sealed versions. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER denying Defendants' 76 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and finding as moot Plaintiff's 78 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Re: Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification and Stay. The Court hereby finds and ORDERS that Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Defendant's Pending Motion (Dkt. # 83 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' unopposed 74 Stipulated Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litems for the purpose of evaluating any proposed settlement. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 69 Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litems for the Purpose of Evaluating Settlement. The parties are ORDERED to refile this Motion as a stipulated motion, noted for same-day consideration, no later than December 6, 2017. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting parties' 67 Stipulated Motion to Modify Certain Case Deadlines Deadline for Rule 26(a)(2) Rebuttal Liability Expert Disclosures December 22, 2017; Close of Discovery January 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting 63 Stipulated Motion. The deadline to disclose liability expert testimony only under FRCP 26(a)(2) is extended to 10/27/2017, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting in part Defendants' 46 Motion for Protective Order. Defendant Wright need only respond to Plaintiff's Request for Production No. 2 with records that mention or otherwise relate to the accident at issue in this case. The Motion is otherwise DENIED. Plaintiff's 50 Motion to Compel is GRANTED. Defendants shall produce the two reports identified in their Privilege Log, Dkt. # 51 -1 at 3 within seven (7) days of this Order. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting defendants' 34 Motion to Dismiss; plaintiff may file a second amended complaint within 7 days by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting Defendants' 26 Motion for Protective Order, by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Chief Judge Ricardo S. Martinez granting 21 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Plaintiff's negligent hiring, retention, entrustment, supervision, and training claims are dismissed. If he so chooses, Plaintiff may file an amended complaint, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, to include paragraphs that "merely set forth facts and assertions which do not include causes of action or claims of negligence." Amended Pleadings due by 3/17/2017. (SSM)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 27 Stipulated Motion to dismiss without prejudice Defendant Disttech, Inc., by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Head v. Disttech, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Romero Head
Represented By: Kevin Coluccio
Represented By: Joseph A. Fried(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: R. Sean McEvoy(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Romeo A. Head
Represented By: Kevin Coluccio
Represented By: Joseph A. Fried(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: R. Sean McEvoy(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Disttech, Inc
Represented By: Dylan E Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Disttech, LLC
Represented By: Dylan E Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacques A. Wright
Represented By: Dylan E Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Wright
Represented By: Dylan E Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?