Northwest Sheet Metal Workers Organizational Trust et al v. 4 Seasons Mechanical et al
Plaintiff: Northwest Sheet Metal Workers Organizational Trust, Northwest Sheet Metal Workers Welfare Fund, Northwest Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Northwest Sheet Metal Workers Supplemental Pension Trust, Western Washington Sheet Metal Training Trust, Northwest Sheet Metal Labor Management Cooperation Trust and Sheet Metal Workers Local 66
Defendant: 4 Seasons Mechanical and Mike Mattila
Case Number: 2:2016cv01736
Filed: November 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 17 Renewed Motion for Default Judgment, authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER directing plaintiff to file, within twenty-eight (28) days of the date of this Minute Order, either (i) a renewed motion for default judgment against Matilla, or (ii) a status report indicating why such motion cannot or will not be filed and whether the claims against Matilla may be dismissed without prejudice and without costs. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 9 Motion for Default Judgment against Mike Matilla ; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by 6/23/2017 why plaintiffs' claims against 4 Seasons Mechanical should not be dismissed for failing to effect timely service. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed for failing to comply with the Court's order requiring submission of a Joint Status Report by May 1, 2017, docket no. 7 . Show Cause Response due by 5/26/2017. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER extending following deadlines: FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 4/17/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/1/2017, Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan due by 5/1/2017. Plaintiffs shall have an additional thirty (35) days from the date of this Minute Order to effectuate service on defendant 4 Seasons Mechanical, Inc. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (swt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northwest Sheet Metal Workers Organizational Trust et al v. 4 Seasons Mechanical et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Sheet Metal Workers Organizational Trust
Represented By: Daniel Hutzenbiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Sheet Metal Workers Welfare Fund
Represented By: Daniel Hutzenbiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund
Represented By: Daniel Hutzenbiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Sheet Metal Workers Supplemental Pension Trust
Represented By: Daniel Hutzenbiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Washington Sheet Metal Training Trust
Represented By: Daniel Hutzenbiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Sheet Metal Labor Management Cooperation Trust
Represented By: Daniel Hutzenbiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheet Metal Workers Local 66
Represented By: Daniel Hutzenbiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4 Seasons Mechanical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Mattila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?