Braddock v. Zaycon Foods LLC et al

Plaintiff: Richard Braddock
Defendant: Zaycon Foods LLC, Frank R Maresca, Jane Doe Maresca, Michael Giunta, Jane Doe Giunta, Mike Conrad, Jane Doe Conrad, Adam Kremin and Jane Doe Kremin
Case Number: 2:2016cv01756
Filed: November 14, 2016
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2018 110 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting defendants' 104 Motion to Compel. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
July 3, 2018 103 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re parties' 102 Stipulated Motion; EXTENDING deadline to file discovery motions to 7/30/2018; terminating as moot defendants' 96 MOTION to Continue Interim Discovery Motion Deadline, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
June 28, 2018 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defendants' 99 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; Discovery deadline extended to 8/20/2018, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
June 22, 2018 95 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Deadline to File Discovery Motions re parties' 94 Stipulated Motion. The deadline to file discovery motions is hereby extended from June 14, 2018 to June 22, 2018. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH)
May 29, 2018 91 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DEADLINES: Bench Trial is set for 1/22/2019. Motions due by 6/14/2018, Discovery completed by 7/20/2018, Dispositive motions due by 10/25/2018, Motions in Limine due by 12/20/2018, Pretria l Order due by 1/4/2019, Pretrial Conference set for 1/11/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Trial briefs to be submitted by 1/4/2019, Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law to be submitted by 1/7/2019. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
February 28, 2018 84 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER re parties' 83 Stipulated Motion to Continue Trial Date; the Court STRIKES status conference previously scheduled for 3/8/2018; STAYS case for sixty (60) days; parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report by 4/30/2018, authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
February 8, 2018 80 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 79 Stipulated Motion; in-court Status Conference is RESCHEDULED for 3/8/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly; All other deadlines remain the same. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
January 25, 2018 75 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER setting an in-court Status Conference set for 3/2/2018 at 10:00 AM; parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before 2/28/2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
January 22, 2018 74 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting plaintiff's 55 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint, Plaintiff shall file the first amended complaint no later than 2/2/2018; striking without prejudice defendants' 50 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; striking as moot plaintiff's 53 Motion to Extend Briefing Deadline in Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; striking as moot parties' 72 Stipulated Motion to Extend Briefing Deadline. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
January 8, 2018 63 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER extending briefing deadline of defendants' motion for summary judgment re parties' 57 Stipulation; RENOTING defendants' 50 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment : Noting Date 1/19/2018, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
October 25, 2017 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER resetting Trial Date and Related Dates re parties' 47 Stipulated Motion. Bench Trial is set for 10/22/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Amended Pleadings due by 1/15/2018, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRC P 26(a)(2) due by 1/15/2018, Discovery Motions due by 3/15/2018, Discovery completed by 4/20/2018, Dispositive motions due by 7/26/2018, Motions in Limine due by 9/20/2018, Pretrial Order due by 10/5/2018, Trial briefs and Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law to be submitted by 10/5/2018, Pretrial Conference set for 10/12/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH)
April 21, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants Jane Doe Giunta, Michael Giunta, Zaycon Foods LLC's 15 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part Defendants Jane Doe Conrad, Mike Conrad, Adam Kremin, Jane Doe Kremin, Frank R Maresca, Jane Doe Maresca's 17 Motion to Dismiss. Any Amended Complaint shall be filed within thirty (30) days of the date of this Minute Order. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braddock v. Zaycon Foods LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Braddock
Represented By: Michael J. Brown
Represented By: David L Tift
Represented By: David G Trachtenberg(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zaycon Foods LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank R Maresca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Maresca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Giunta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Giunta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Kremin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Kremin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?