Twede et al v. University of Washington
Plaintiff: Erik Twede, Barry Long and Olivia Williams
Defendant: University of Washington
Case Number: 2:2016cv01761
Filed: November 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Skagit
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STIPULATION AND ORDER re Parties' 77 Stipulated MOTION TO EXTEND CERTAIN CONSENT DECREE DEADLINES. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER APPROVING CONSENT DECREE re: 64 Stipulated MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting parties' 62 Stipulated Motion to Extend Schedule 60 Days; Notice of Settlement. If the parties fail to finalize their settlement agreement within 60 days, the court will set definite dates for the pretrial conference an d trial at that time. The court further DIRECTS the Clerk to change the noting dates for: (1) the motion to limit expert testimony (Dkt. # 52 ) to May 18, 2018, (2) the motion for partial summary judgment (Dkt. # 54 ) to May 25, 2018, and (3) the motion for reconsideration (Dkt. # 57 ) to April 20, 2018. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 59 Stipulated Motion to Extend the Briefing Schedule. Defendant's 52 MOTION to Limit Expert Witness Testimony is re-noted for 3/16/2018. Defendant's 54 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment is re-noted for 3/23/2018. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER directing Defendant to respond to Plaintiffs' 57 Motion for Reconsideration by 3/9/2018. Plaintiffs' reply, if any, due 3/16/2018. Clerk is directed to re-note Plaintiffs' 57 MOTION for Reconsideration for 3/16/2018. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 32 Motion to Dismiss; denying Plaintiff's 35 request for leave to amend their first amended complaint. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 44 Stipulated Motion to extend deadline for expert rebuttal testimony and the discovery cutoff. The Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports are due by 2/6/2018. The court denies extending the discovery cutoff date. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 42 Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadlines. Expert Rebuttal Testimony exchange due by 1/16/2018, Discovery completed by 2/6/2018. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 39 Stipulated Motion extending deadline to exchange expert testimony to 12/1/2017, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Twede et al v. University of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Twede
Represented By: Darrell L Cochran
Represented By: Kevin M. Hastings
Represented By: Christopher Eric Love
Represented By: Conrad Reynoldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Long
Represented By: Darrell L Cochran
Represented By: Kevin M. Hastings
Represented By: Christopher Eric Love
Represented By: Conrad Reynoldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivia Williams
Represented By: Darrell L Cochran
Represented By: Kevin M. Hastings
Represented By: Christopher Eric Love
Represented By: Conrad Reynoldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Washington
Represented By: Seth J Berntsen
Represented By: Nancy M. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?