Wong v. Seattle School District No. 1
Plaintiff: Jennifer and Eugene Wong
Defendant: Seattle School District No. 1
Case Number: 2:2016cv01774
Filed: November 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW: the Court finds in favor of Defendant on all claims. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (MW)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 65 Motion for Leave to Amend Exhibit and Witness List signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (TH)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER on Defendant's 47 MOTIONS in Limine and Plaintiffs' 49 MOTIONS in Limine, signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. The parties' motions in limine are granted in part, denied in part, and reserved in part. (VE)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (TH)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting Defendant's 11 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (TH)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting parties' 22 Stipulated Motion for Partial Dismissal signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (TH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wong v. Seattle School District No. 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer and Eugene Wong
Represented By: Bridget Bourgette Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seattle School District No. 1
Represented By: Sam Chalfant
Represented By: David T. Hokit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?